Global Patent Index - EP 0898253 A3

EP 0898253 A3 2000-09-13 - Enetertainment machines

Title (en)

Enetertainment machines

Title (de)

Unterhaltungsautomat

Title (fr)

Machine d'amusement

Publication

EP 0898253 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98306437 A

Priority

GB 9717053 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: GB2328311A] An entertainment machine 1 that selects a combination of symbols and displays them at a win zone 11, a win indication including an evaluation of a win award in relation to a stake made 20, is characterised by the provision of player controls 6a, 6b operable to select independently, from specified ranges a stake enhancement factor 18 and a game win mode 17. Symbols may be in the form of a 3x3 matrix 11 with up to five win lines, or a 4x3 matrix. The win mode may include lines or other arrangements in which symbol combinations are assessed for a win evaluation. All combinations of symbols, one taken from each column 9 in a 3x3 matrix may be chosen. The win mode 17 may be; determined by the presence of special symbols, related to losing game awards, or may not be related to displayed symbol combinations, including losing game awards. Preferably, the enhancement factor has a selection of numerical multipliers applied to all or selected wins. The controls 6a, 6b for the win mode 17 and enhancement factor 18 may be separate. Both controls 6a, 6b can be available; at the start of every game, after the game has started, or only in some games. One control may be partially available during a game. The win mode 17 and enhancement factor 18 may be displayed visually. The enhancement factor 18 can be applied to all or part of the available stake 20. Preferably, a pay out percentage 21 can be varied and displayed numerically. Preferably, a control system (12 figure 3) determines a variable win likelihood that is linked to the win mode and enhancement factor. The likelihood may be displayed numerically along side the win mode and stake enhancement factor.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07F 17/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07F 17/32 (2006.01); G07F 17/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 17/3244 (2013.01); G07F 17/34 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

GB 2328311 A 19990217; GB 2328311 B 20010912; GB 9717053 D0 19971015; EP 0898253 A2 19990224; EP 0898253 A3 20000913

INPADOC legal status


2007-05-16 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20061229

2001-05-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE CH DE ES GB GR IT LI NL PT

2001-05-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010312

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-02-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES GB GR IT LI NL PT

1999-02-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI