Global Patent Index - EP 0898256 A3

EP 0898256 A3 2000-07-05 - Method to exchange data as well as the request station and answering station therefor

Title (en)

Method to exchange data as well as the request station and answering station therefor

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Austausch von Information, sowie Abfragestation und Antwortstation dafür

Title (fr)

Procédé d'échange d'information ainsi que les unités d'interrogation et de réponse associées

Publication

EP 0898256 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98440168 A

Priority

DE 19735523 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0898256A2] The road vehicle (1) has two communication units, one of which can be fixed to the windscreen (11) and contains identification data. The other provides other vehicle condition data (12). Both units are interrogated by a remote station using a defined interrogation procedure. Communication is made via roadside transmitters (2).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08G 1/017; G08G 1/09

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/017 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/017 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19735523 A1 19990218; AT 284564 T 20041215; EP 0898256 A2 19990224; EP 0898256 A3 20000705; EP 0898256 B1 20041208

INPADOC legal status


2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150721

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110731

2012-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110731

2012-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110731

2012-04-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM01

- Ref Document Number: 284564

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20110731

2012-02-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2010-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100714

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-10-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100726

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-11-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050909

2005-01-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59812352

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-01-13

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: CABINET ROLAND NITHARDT CONSEILS EN PROPRIETE INDU

2004-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-12-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

2004-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031119

2001-03-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE LI

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001005

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7G 08G 1/017 A, 7G 08G 1/09 B

1999-02-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

1999-02-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI