Global Patent Index - EP 0898259 A3

EP 0898259 A3 2000-06-07 - Traffic guiding system

Title (en)

Traffic guiding system

Title (de)

Verkehrsleitsystem

Title (fr)

Système de guidage pour le trafic

Publication

EP 0898259 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98113076 A

Priority

DE 19736050 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0898259A2] The system has a number of roadside units (16) that transmit data to passing vehicles (14). Each vehicle has an onboard receiver and controller (26). The roadside units are linked to a central computer that outputs traffic control data dependent upon such things as weather and road conditions.The data may be in the form of speed limit data that is received and used by the energy management controller.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08G 1/0967

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/0967 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/096725 (2013.01); G08G 1/096741 (2013.01); G08G 1/096775 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] GB 2179824 A 19870311 - VERNON MALCOLM BARRY
  • [X] DE 4110345 A1 19921001 - THUNS MICHAEL ANDREAS [DE]
  • [X] FR 2652932 A1 19910412 - CLASTOT DOMINIQUE
  • [A] EGAN-KRIEGER G V ET AL: "Object oriented device control using the CAN bus", NUCLEAR INSTRUMENTS & METHODS IN PHYSICS RESEARCH, SECTION - A: ACCELERATORS, SPECTROMETERS, DETECTORS AND ASSOCIATED EQUIPMENT,NL,NORTH-HOLLAND PUBLISHING COMPANY. AMSTERDAM, vol. A352, no. 1, 15 December 1994 (1994-12-15), pages 204 - 206, XP004005725, ISSN: 0168-9002

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0898259 A2 19990224; EP 0898259 A3 20000607; DE 19736050 A1 19990225

INPADOC legal status


2001-10-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20001208

2001-03-22 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-02-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-02-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-02-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI