Global Patent Index - EP 0898341 A3

EP 0898341 A3 2000-03-15 - Plug-in contact pair, plug-in contact and electric network component

Title (en)

Plug-in contact pair, plug-in contact and electric network component

Title (de)

Steckverbinderpaar, Steckverbinder und Bauteil eines elektrischen Netzwerks

Title (fr)

Paire de connecteurs à fiche, connecteur à fiche et composant de réseau électrique

Publication

EP 0898341 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98660079 A

Priority

FI 973473 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0898341A2] This invention relates to a plug-in contact pair consists of a male contact (1) and a female contact (2), wherein a first coupling element (6) of the male contact (1) and a second coupling element (9) of the female contact (2) are formed to be each other's counterparts in such a manner that they can be coupled to each other to provide an electric contact between a first and a second electric wires, and wherein the male and the female contacts are provided with locking means (12 to 16) which lock them together. In order that the interlocking of the plug-in contacts could be unlocked more easily than before, the locking means (12 to 16) of both the male contact and the female contact are formed for unlocking in such a way that a force exerted on the locking means of either one of the plug-in contacts (1, 2) unlocks the interlocking of the male contact and the female contact. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 23/02; H01R 9/24; H01R 13/627; H01R 31/02; H01R 31/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/627 (2006.01); H01R 13/633 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/6271 (2013.01); H01R 13/633 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0898341 A2 19990224; EP 0898341 A3 20000315; DK 200300272 U3 20031229; ES 1057333 U 20040716; ES 1057333 Y 20041101; FI 102861 B1 19990226; FI 102861 B 19990226; FI 973473 A0 19970822; PT 9963 T 20041029

INPADOC legal status


2004-08-25 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20031211

2004-05-06 [110E] REQUEST FOR CONVERSION INTO A NATIONAL PATENT APPLICATION

- Effective date: 20031208

2002-07-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ENSTO ELECTRIC OY

2000-11-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2000-08-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000620

2000-04-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000301

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01R 23/02 A, 7H 01R 9/24 B, 7H 01R 13/627 B, 7H 01R 31/06 B, 7H 01R 31/02 B

1999-02-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

1999-02-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI