Global Patent Index - EP 0898357 B8

EP 0898357 B8 2009-02-18 - DC energy converter device

Title (en)

DC energy converter device

Title (de)

Gleichstromwandlervorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de conversion d'énergie à courant continu

Publication

EP 0898357 B8 (FR)

Application

EP 98402089 A

Priority

FR 9710538 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0898357A1] Two cyclically switched converter circuits (4,15) based on bridge-connected IGB transistors, are coupled through a transformer (1), one operating as an inverter, the other as a rectifier, supplying a load. Each bridge arm comprises an IGB transistor (5,6,7,8;16,17,18,19) with a diode (9,10,11,12;20,21,22,23) connected across emitter and collector. Externally, bridges are connected respectively to an incoming DC supply (VI) and a load, operating, typically, at a lower voltage. Energy is stored on the secondary side in a series inductance (25), part or all of which is obtained by utilising the transformer leakage reactance. Output voltage control below a maximum determined by the transformer transformation ratio is obtained by varying the switching angle of the inverter bridge transistors. Higher output voltages can be obtained by similar intervention, at the same operating frequency, in the rectifier bridge. The transformer may be either 1-ph or 3-ph.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H02M 3/335 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H02M 3/33584 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0898357 A1 19990224; EP 0898357 B1 20081119; EP 0898357 B8 20090218; DE 69840222 D1 20090102; FR 2767612 A1 19990226; FR 2767612 B1 20020614; US 6067237 A 20000523

INPADOC legal status


2017-11-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170821

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-11-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BUGNION S.A., CH

2017-11-15 [REG CH PCOW] CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF PATENT OWNER(S)

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: 48 RUE ALBERT DHALENNE, 93400 SAINT-OUEN (FR)

2017-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170821

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170828

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170822

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170822

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-09-20 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ALSTOM TRANSPORT TECHNOLOGIES, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ALSTOM TRANSPORT TECHNOLOGIES, LEVALLOIS-PERRET, FR

- Document: DE 69840222

2015-12-16 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20151119 AND 20151125

2015-06-29 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ALSTOM TRANSPORT TECHNOLOGIES, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ALSTOM TRANSPORT S.A., LEVALLOIS-PERRET, FR

- Document: DE 69840222

2015-04-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: ALSTOM TRANSPORT TECHNOLOGIES, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ALSTOM TRANSPORT SA, FR

2011-05-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-03-16 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110301

2009-11-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090814

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-10-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090820

2009-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69840222 P 20090102

2008-12-10 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: ALSTOM TRANSPORT SA

2008-11-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2008-11-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE GB IT LI NL

2008-11-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-12-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071109

2003-11-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM TRANSPORT S.A.

1999-11-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE CH DE GB IT LI NL

1999-10-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990824

1999-02-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE GB IT LI NL

1999-02-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI