Global Patent Index - EP 0898548 B1

EP 0898548 B1 2001-05-30 - MARINE PROPULSION SYSTEM

Title (en)

MARINE PROPULSION SYSTEM

Title (de)

VORTRIEBSSYSTEM FÜR WASSERFAHRZEUGE

Title (fr)

APPAREIL PROPULSEUR NAVAL

Publication

EP 0898548 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97902810 A

Priority

  • SE 9700163 W
  • SE 9601793 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9743173A1] A propulsive transmission system comprising contra-rotating propellers which are connected to a planet gear in the hub. The planet gear is driven by a horizontal or slightly angled shaft to the sun gear. The sun gear operates at a rotational speed which is considerably greater than that of the motor by gearing up the speed of the motor by one and a half to three times using a step up gear. In parallel with the step up gear, parallel gear wheels can be arranged with clutches in order to temporarily create another gearing ("gear box"). The hub can be mounted in a steerable outboard housing which may also be provided with a trimming arrangement. For an inboard motor having a steerable housing, the power is transmitted via a cardan joint to thereby permit trimming and steering.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63H 5/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63H 5/10 (2006.01); B63H 20/10 (2006.01); B63H 20/14 (2006.01); B63H 20/20 (2006.01); B63H 20/22 (2006.01); B63H 20/28 (2006.01); B63H 23/02 (2006.01); B63H 23/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63H 23/02 (2013.01); B63H 5/10 (2013.01); B63H 20/10 (2013.01); B63H 20/20 (2013.01); B63H 20/22 (2013.01); B63H 20/285 (2013.01); B63H 23/30 (2013.01); B63H 2020/006 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE DK FI GB GR IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9743173 A1 19971120; AU 1681297 A 19971205; AU 728814 B2 20010118; CA 2255125 A1 19971120; DE 69705043 D1 20010705; EP 0898548 A1 19990303; EP 0898548 B1 20010530; JP 2000510072 A 20000808; SE 9601793 D0 19960512

INPADOC legal status


2002-09-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020203

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-02-03 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020203

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-11-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-08-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010831

2001-08-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010831

2001-08-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010830

2001-08-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010830

2001-07-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69705043 20010705

2001-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK FI GB GR IT LI NL SE

2001-05-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-05-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-05-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-05-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010530

1999-04-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990222

1999-03-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981208

1999-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK FI GB GR IT LI NL SE