Global Patent Index - EP 0898628 A4

EP 0898628 A4 2001-02-28 - METHOD OF INSULATING METAL DECK ROOF STRUCTURES

Title (en)

METHOD OF INSULATING METAL DECK ROOF STRUCTURES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM ISOLIEREN VON METALLPLATTENDACHKONSTRUKTIONEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE D'ISOLATION DE STRUCTURES DE TOIT METALLIQUES EN PONT

Publication

EP 0898628 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97916101 A

Priority

  • US 9704447 W
  • US 64599396 A
  • US 71659296 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9743497A1] A method for providing a roof structure (86) having a plurality of trusses (31) spaced apart from one another in a parallel arrangement is diclosed. The trusses each have a top portion (42). A support sheet (50) is payed out so that the support sheet depends from the top portions of adjacent trusses. Flexible insulation material (54) is applied above the support sheet so that the flexible insulation material is supported by the support sheet. Metal deck sheets (58, 92) are fastened to the top portion of the trusses, thereby forming a metal deck (59). A temporary waterproofing sealant (88, 96) is applied to the metal deck to protect the flexible insulation material, thereby creating a partially completed roof structure (40). Rigid insulation board (82) and a waterproofing membrane (84) are subsequently applied onto the metal deck, thereby forming a completed permanently sealed roof structure (86).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 7/00; E04D 13/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/76 (2006.01); E04B 7/00 (2006.01); E04D 13/16 (2006.01); E04D 15/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/1643 (2013.01); E04B 7/00 (2013.01); E04D 13/1618 (2013.01); E04D 15/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9743497 A1 19971120; AU 2336397 A 19971205; AU 714102 B2 19991216; BR 9709206 A 19990810; CA 2251936 A1 19971120; CN 1218528 A 19990602; EP 0898628 A1 19990303; EP 0898628 A4 20010228; JP 2000510209 A 20000808; NO 985249 A 19981110; NO 985249 D0 19981110; NZ 332515 A 19990429; TW 405009 B 20000911

INPADOC legal status


2003-08-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030103

2002-10-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020823

2001-02-28 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20010117

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

2001-02-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 04B 7/00 A, 7E 04D 13/16 B

1999-05-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WENRICK, DENNIS, K.

1999-05-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: NEIFER, DON, A.

1999-05-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: JANICKI, RICHARD, T.

1999-03-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981207

1999-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE