Global Patent Index - EP 0898636 B1

EP 0898636 B1 2000-08-09 - DOOR WITH DOOR LEAF FITTED TO ABUT OPTIONALLY ON THE RIGHT-HAND OR ON THE LEFT-HAND SIDE

Title (en)

DOOR WITH DOOR LEAF FITTED TO ABUT OPTIONALLY ON THE RIGHT-HAND OR ON THE LEFT-HAND SIDE

Title (de)

TÜR MIT WAHLWEISE RECHTS-LINKS-ANSCHLAGEND EINBAUBAREM TÜRBLATT

Title (fr)

PORTE A VENTAIL POUVANT TRE MONTE DE FACON A VENIR BUTER, AU CHOIX, A GAUCHE OU A DROITE

Publication

EP 0898636 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97925846 A

Priority

  • DE 9700998 W
  • DE 29608904 U
  • DE 19700219 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9744560A1] The invention relates to a door, in particular a fire-prevention door, with a frame (3), vertical beams (6) and a door leaf fitted to be attached optionally on the right-hand or on the left-hand side. The structure of said door is such that for a simplified embodiment and, in particular, handling during installation, both vertical beams (6) of the frame (3), to be used for both installations of the door leaf (2) in the same installation position into the brickwork (7) or the like having the door opening (8), have blade pockets (10) substantially opposite each other. The blade tabs (14) of the hinge parts (12) are optionally inserted into the hinge pockets (10) of the one or the other of the two vertical beams (6) of the frame (3), and fixed therein depending on in which of the two abutment positions the door leaf (2) is positioned as a result of turning about 180 DEG parallel to the frame plane. The form of said door is, in particular, such that between the blade pocket (10) and the blade tab (14) a detent closure (23, 25; 23', 25') becomes operative at the end of insertion of the hinges between the door leaf and the frame and is provided, in particular with a detent nose (23, 23') which is acted upon in relation to the hinge blade housing (17; 27, 28) and, consequently, the vertical beam (6) to be resilient against the broad surface of the blade tabs (14) and engages to lock behind a blade tab (14) surface (25, 25') pointing in the direction contrary to insertion when locked.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 1/52; E05D 7/02; E05D 7/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 5/02 (2006.01); E05D 7/02 (2006.01); E05D 7/12 (2006.01); E06B 1/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 7/12 (2013.01); E05D 5/023 (2013.01); E05D 7/02 (2013.01); E06B 1/526 (2013.01); E05D 2007/128 (2013.01); E05Y 2600/53 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/132 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/134 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR IT LI LU NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9744560 A1 19971127; AT 195362 T 20000815; EP 0898636 A1 19990303; EP 0898636 B1 20000809; ES 2149599 T3 20001101; PL 187779 B1 20041029; PL 330638 A1 19990524

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170517

2017-08-25 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20170825

2017-07-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 195362 T

- Effective date: 20170516

2017-05-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2017-05-16 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59702143

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160711

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160523

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160524

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160519

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160523

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160526

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-22 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59702143

- Representative's name: KASTEL PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2013-05-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110516

2012-03-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2012-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111201

2011-12-14 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20111201

2011-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *HORMANN K.G. FREISEN

- Effective date: 20110531

2010-10-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20100531

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20100527

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-07-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20100518

- Year of fee payment: 14

2001-07-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-11-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2149599 T3

2000-09-26 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

2000-09-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702143 20000914

2000-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-08-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWALTSBUERO EDER AG

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR IT LI LU NL

2000-08-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 195362 T 20000815

1999-11-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990923

1999-11-10 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR IT LI LU NL

1999-03-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981210

1999-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR IT LI LU NL