Global Patent Index - EP 0898687 A4

EP 0898687 A4 2000-02-23 - BURNER APPARATUS AND METHOD

Title (en)

BURNER APPARATUS AND METHOD

Title (de)

BRENNER UND VERBRENNUNGSVERFAHREN

Title (fr)

BRULEUR ET PROCEDE

Publication

EP 0898687 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 96915860 A

Priority

US 9607051 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9744618A1] A burner apparatus and method for the combustion of a fuel and an oxidizer includes a burner block (7) having a fuel line (1) for feeding fuel to a fuel port opening (12) into a combustion chamber and a plurality of oxidizer lines (32, 33, 34) positioned around the fuel line (1) for feeding an oxidizer to oxidizer ports (17, 18, 19, 20) to the combustion chamber for combustion with the fuel from the fuel port (12). The oxidizer lines and ports (13, 14, 15, 16 and 17, 18, 19, 20) are spaced around the fuel port (12) so that controlling the oxidizer is used to change the position and shape of the flame in the combustion chamber. Oxidizer control valves (36, 37, 38, 39) vary the amount of oxidizer fed through the oxidizer line so that the oxidizer control valves (36, 37, 38, 39) for each set of oxidizer lines are spaced around the fuel port (12) to allow both the position and shape of the burner flame to be controlled.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23C 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23C 7/00 (2006.01); F23D 14/22 (2006.01); F23M 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23D 14/22 (2013.01); F23C 7/00 (2013.01); F23M 5/025 (2013.01); F23D 2900/00013 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9744618 A1 19971127; AT 222341 T 20020815; AU 5751996 A 19971209; CA 2254978 A1 19971127; CA 2254978 C 20080909; CZ 292563 B6 20031015; CZ 9803697 A3 19990414; DE 69623048 D1 20020919; DE 69623048 T2 20030430; EP 0898687 A1 19990303; EP 0898687 A4 20000223; EP 0898687 B1 20020814; MX PA98009613 A 20040310

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160516

2016-07-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Ref Legal Event Code: MK07

- Ref Document Number: 222341

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20160517

2016-06-08 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20160516

2016-05-18 [REG NL MK] PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MK

- Effective date: 20160516

2016-05-17 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 69623048

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-11-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150430

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150516

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150513

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150527

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150518

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150518

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150528

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150516

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-05-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 20

2003-08-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030515

2002-11-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-09-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69623048

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-09-19

2002-08-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR GB IT NL SE

2002-08-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2002-08-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 222341

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-08-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2001-11-21 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: BURNER APPARATUS

2001-11-14 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: BURNER APPARATUS

2001-03-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010206

2000-02-23 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20000112

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR GB IT NL SE

1999-03-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19981124

1999-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR GB IT NL SE