Global patent index - EP 0898688 B1

EP 0898688 B1 2000-09-06 - PROCESS FOR MINIMISING THE NOx CONTENT OF FLUE GASES

Title (en)

PROCESS FOR MINIMISING THE NOx CONTENT OF FLUE GASES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR MINIMIERUNG DES NOx-GEHALTES IN RAUCHGASEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR REDUIRE AU MINIMUM LA TENEUR EN NOx DES GAZ DE FUMEE

Publication

EP 0898688 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97923043 A

Priority

  • DE 19619764 A
  • EP 9702389 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19619764A1] The invention relates to a process for operating incineration furnaces (1) for sludge, rubbish or coal, in which the incineration product is burnt in a combustion chamber (2) of the furnace (1) and the flue gases (12) produced are discharged via an open area (4) above the combustion chamber (2). A turbulent motion is imparted to the flue gases (12) in the open area (4) without substantially increasing the turbulence in the combustion chamber (2). The process of the invention has the advantage that the NOx content of the flue gases can be further reduced by relatively simple means. Figures of about 100 mg/m<3> have been attained in a large industrial sludge incineration plant.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23L 7/00; F23G 5/30; F23M 9/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23L 7/00 (2006.01); F23C 10/00 (2006.01); F23C 99/00 (2006.01); F23G 5/16 (2006.01); F23G 5/30 (2006.01); F23G 7/00 (2006.01); F23J 1/00 (2006.01); F23M 9/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23G 5/30 (2013.01); F23G 5/165 (2013.01); F23G 2209/12 (2013.01); F23L 2900/07002 (2013.01); F23L 2900/07009 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR GB IE IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19619764 A1 19971120; DE 19619764 C2 20031218; AR 007146 A1 19991013; AT 196192 T 20000915; AU 2895497 A 19971209; CN 1136412 C 20040128; CN 1221483 A 19990630; CO 4700569 A1 19981229; EP 0898688 A1 19990303; EP 0898688 B1 20000906; ID 17426 A 19971120; IL 127051 D0 19990922; JP 2000510942 A 20000822; KR 20000011104 A 20000225; WO 9744620 A1 19971127; ZA 9704260 B 19971117

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160523

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160530

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160525

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160523

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160526

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160530

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160523

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160602

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-05-02 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59702318

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: MAI DOERR BESIER PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-08-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-12-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-12-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20001116

2000-11-09 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. C. GREGORJ S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-10-18 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2000-10-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59702318

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-10-12

2000-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IE IT LI

2000-09-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 196192

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-09-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-08-09 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IE IT LI

1999-11-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: INFRASERV GMBH & CO. HOECHST KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990323

1999-03-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19981217

1999-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IE IT LI