Global Patent Index - EP 0898771 B1

EP 0898771 B1 2002-09-04 - AN ELECTRONIC INTRUSION DETECTION SYSTEM FOR MONITORED ENVIRONMENTS

Title (en)

AN ELECTRONIC INTRUSION DETECTION SYSTEM FOR MONITORED ENVIRONMENTS

Title (de)

ELEKTRONISCHES EINDRINGALARMSYSTEM FÜR ÜBERWACHTE UMGEBUNGEN

Title (fr)

SYSTEME ELECTRONIQUE DE DETECTION D'INTRUSION DESTINE A DES ENVIRONNEMENTS SURVEILLES

Publication

EP 0898771 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97935552 A

Priority

  • EP 9704142 W
  • IT TO961080 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9828724A1] The invention relates to an electronic intrusion detection system for monitoring environments, comprising at least one electronic sensor (1a, 1b, 1c) responsive to movements occurring in said environment and adapted to modify at least one characteristic of its electrical output in response to the presence of a moving body in said environment; means (10a, 10b, 10c) for generating an alarm signal (ALARM) when said modification meets a predetermined condition; and transducer means (20a, 20b, 20c) for continuously converting said modification of the output from said electric sensor (1a, 1b, 1c) into a signal that can be perceived by a human being. An alarm control unit (30) connected to said alarm generating means (10a, 10b, 10c) and transducer means (20a, 20b, 20c) includes means for forwarding the signals to the surveillance personnel through a telephone line (43).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08B 29/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08B 29/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08B 29/183 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9828724 A1 19980702; AT 223606 T 20020915; AU 3850097 A 19980717; AU 727852 B2 20010104; CA 2242870 A1 19980702; CA 2242870 C 20030218; CZ 293095 B6 20040218; CZ 9802688 A3 19981216; DE 69715183 D1 20021010; EP 0898771 A1 19990303; EP 0898771 B1 20020904; HU 222942 B1 20031229; HU 9902390 A2 19991129; HU 9902390 A3 20000128; IT 1289800 B1 19981016; IT TO961080 A1 19980624; PL 184165 B1 20020930; PL 328502 A1 19990201; ZA 9706988 B 19990416

INPADOC legal status


2017-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170729

2017-11-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170730

2017-09-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 223606 T

- Effective date: 20170730

2017-08-23 [REG IE MK9A] PATENT EXPIRED

2017-08-23 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20170729

2017-07-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2017-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20161024

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-12-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160708

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160727

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160712

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160728

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20160715

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160720

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-07-29 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20110616

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090730

2009-04-24 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2009-04-24 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2009-04-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: TECNOALARM S.R.L.

- Free text: TECNO ALARM S.N.C.#DI TRUCCHI LUCIANO E NEGRO GIOVANNI, STRADA DEL CASCINOTTO, 139/54#I-10156, TORINO (IT) -TRANSFER TO- TECNOALARM S.R.L.#VIA CIRIE 38#10099 SAN MAURO TORINESE (TORINO) (IT)

2007-04-13 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: TECNO ALARM S.N.C.

- Free text: TECNO ALARM S.N.C.#DI TRUCCHI LUCIANO E NEGRO GIOVANNI, STRADA DEL CASCINOTTO, 139/54#I-10156, TORINO (IT) -TRANSFER TO- TECNO ALARM S.N.C.#DI TRUCCHI LUCIANO E NEGRO GIOVANNI, STRADA DEL CASCINOTTO, 139/54#I-10156, TORINO (IT)

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-07-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030730

2003-03-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030328

2003-02-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-01-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KEMIA S.A.

2003-01-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-12-13 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021213

2002-12-05 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021205

2002-12-04 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021204

2002-12-04 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021204

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69715183 20021010

2002-10-02 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2002-09-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-09-04 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-09-04 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-09-04 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-09-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 223606 T 20020915

2001-12-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011024

1999-03-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980511

1999-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE