Global Patent Index - EP 0898779 B1

EP 0898779 B1 2000-01-19 - CIRCUIT BREAKER FOR LOW TENSION WITH CONNECTING BARS

Title (en)

CIRCUIT BREAKER FOR LOW TENSION WITH CONNECTING BARS

Title (de)

LEISTUNGSSCHALTER FÜR NIEDERSPANNUNG MIT ANSCHLUSSSCHIENEN

Title (fr)

DISJONCTEUR POUR BASSE TENSION AVEC RAILS DE RACCORDEMENT

Publication

EP 0898779 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97923817 A

Priority

  • DE 9700976 W
  • DE 19620358 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19643607A1] The switch occupies a housing consisting of a rear wall (25) and a frontal part (26). The connection rails (20,21) of the contact system (11) feature transverse projections or webs (40,46) sized and shaped for abutment against surfaces (41,47) on the rear wall. Each rail is inserted through an opening (27,28) from the front until the projections encounter the abutment surfaces. The upper rail (20) is retained by a pressure piece (43) with fixing screws (44) through one end (42) of an arc horn (36). The lower rail (21) is held by the end (51) of a projection from the frontal part.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 1/58

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 9/46 (2006.01); H01H 1/58 (2006.01); H01H 73/18 (2006.01); H01H 73/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 1/58 (2013.01); H01H 1/5822 (2013.01); H01H 2001/5827 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19643607 A1 19971120; EP 0898779 A1 19990303; EP 0898779 B1 20000119; JP 2000510277 A 20000808; US 6100490 A 20000808; WO 9743775 A1 19971120

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121201

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120531

2013-03-21 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59701045

- Effective date: 20121201

2013-03-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130131

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110718

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-07-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110530

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090507

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080528

- Year of fee payment: 12

2001-01-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-04-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-03-30 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2000-02-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701045 20000224

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

1999-08-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990623

1999-03-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981105

1999-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT