Global Patent Index - EP 0898780 B1

EP 0898780 B1 2000-04-26 - MAGNETICALLY DRIVEN ELECTRIC SWITCH

Title (en)

MAGNETICALLY DRIVEN ELECTRIC SWITCH

Title (de)

ELEKTRISCHER SCHALTER MIT EINEM MAGNETISCHEN ANTRIEB

Title (fr)

COMMUTATEUR ELECTRIQUE A ENTRAINEMENT MAGNETIQUE

Publication

EP 0898780 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97923052 A

Priority

  • DE 19619835 A
  • EP 9702404 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19619835A1] The invention relates to a switch with a magnetic drive having an armature movable linearly between two end positions and connected to at least one switch contact, which is under the influence of magnetically generated forces in the end positions. The armature (23) and a ferromagnetic shunt (24) are arranged one behind the other in a space (18) between a first and a second stop (25, 26). The stops (25, 26) are pole faces of magnetic circuits with a permanent magnet (21, 22) which exerts a force retaining the armature (23), movable towards the first stop (25) by the force of an electromagnet (28), in the first stable end position when the shunt (24) is in its end position at the second stop (26). Through the application of the shunt (24) to the armature (23), the force exerted on the armature (23) by the permanent magnet (21, 22) is reversed and transferred to the shunt (24), so that the shunt (24) is moved to the second stop (26) and the armature (23) to its second stable end position on the shunt (24) and held there by the force of the permanent magnet (21, 22).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 51/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 33/666 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 33/6662 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19619835 A1 19971120; AT 192262 T 20000515; AU 2896297 A 19971209; EP 0898780 A1 19990303; EP 0898780 B1 20000426; ES 2147991 T3 20001001; TR 9802325 T2 19990322; US 6130594 A 20001010; WO 9744802 A1 19971127

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. *EIB

- Effective date: 20050531

2006-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050511

2006-03-10 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-02-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20051201

2006-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050510

2006-01-17 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-01-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051201

2005-12-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051201

2005-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. *EIB

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-11 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050511

2005-05-11 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050511

2005-05-10 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050510

2005-05-10 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050510

2005-05-10 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050510

2004-07-16 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040716

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-05-25 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20040525

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-05-24 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20040524

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-05-24 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20040524

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-05-24 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040524

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-05-21 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20040521

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-05-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040519

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-05-18 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20040518

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-03-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040330

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2147991 T3

2000-08-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000601

2000-05-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701519 20000531

2000-04-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-04-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ARDIN & CIE S.A.

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-04-26 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-04-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 192262 T 20000515

1999-08-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990624

1999-03-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981024

1999-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE