Global Patent Index - EP 0898781 B1

EP 0898781 B1 2000-02-23 - PROCESS FOR ADJUSTING A THERMAL OVERLOAD CUT-OUT

Title (en)

PROCESS FOR ADJUSTING A THERMAL OVERLOAD CUT-OUT

Title (de)

JUSTIERVERFAHREN FÜR THERMISCHE ÜBERLASTAUSLÖSER

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR REGLER UN DECLENCHEUR DE SURCHARGE THERMIQUE

Publication

EP 0898781 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97923776 A

Priority

  • DE 9700891 W
  • DE 19619295 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19619295A1] A process is disclosed for adjusting thermal overload cut-outs. After bimetal strips (1) are synchronised and a release mechanism (3) is possibly pre-adjusted, a current is applied for a certain time to the bimetal strips (1), and the actual adjusting process is carried out at their ends. A device reduces to zero a still remaining release gap ( DELTA y) between the bimetal strips (1) and a mechanical switching-off point (6). This adjusting process dispenses with repetitive checks and time-consuming cooling down intervals.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 83/22; H01H 69/01

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 69/01 (2006.01); H01H 83/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 83/223 (2013.01); H01H 69/01 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19619295 A1 19971120; DE 19619295 C2 20031023; CN 1060880 C 20010117; CN 1219278 A 19990609; EP 0898781 A1 19990303; EP 0898781 B1 20000223; US 6028757 A 20000222; WO 9743779 A1 19971120

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-30 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59701151

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160429

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160620

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2001-02-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-05-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-03-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701151 20000330

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2000-02-23 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000223

1999-07-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990615

1999-03-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981105

1999-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT