Global Patent Index - EP 0898832 B1

EP 0898832 B1 2003-06-18 - A METHOD AND A DETECTOR UNIT FOR SETTING UP CONNECTIONS IN A TELETRANSMISSION NETWORK

Title (en)

A METHOD AND A DETECTOR UNIT FOR SETTING UP CONNECTIONS IN A TELETRANSMISSION NETWORK

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND DETEKTOREINHEIT ZUM VERBINDUNGSAUFBAU IN EINEM FERNÜBERTRAGUNGSNETZ

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET UNITE DE DETECTION PERMETTANT D'ETABLIR DES CONNEXIONS DANS UN RESEAU DE TELETRANSMISSIONS

Publication

EP 0898832 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97919298 A

Priority

  • DK 9700178 W
  • DK 47096 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9740614A1] In a method of setting up connections for the transfer of information in the form of calls between at least two arbitrary subscribers in a teletransmission network (1), it is detected at a subscriber interface on the basis of an identification associated with a given call whether the call is of a first type or of a second type. Then the connection is set up via a first transmission path comprising one or more exchanges (2) in case of calls of the first type, and via a second transmission path bypassing the exchange or exchanges (2) in case of calls of the second type. A detector unit (25; 41) for use in the setting up of connections in such a teletransmission network (1) comprises means (32, 33; 43) for detecting on the basis of an identification associated with a given call whether the call is of the first type or of the second type. The detector unit moreover comprises means (34) for setting up calls of the first type via the first transmission path and calls of the second type via the second transmission path.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04L 12/64; H04M 3/42; H04Q 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04M 3/42 (2006.01); H04L 12/64 (2006.01); H04M 3/00 (2006.01); H04Q 3/00 (2006.01); H04Q 11/04 (2006.01); H04L 12/70 (2013.01); H04M 7/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04L 12/6418 (2013.01); H04Q 3/0016 (2013.01); H04Q 11/0478 (2013.01); H04J 2203/0066 (2013.01); H04L 2012/563 (2013.01); H04L 2012/5663 (2013.01); H04L 2012/6443 (2013.01); H04L 2012/6475 (2013.01); H04L 2012/6486 (2013.01); H04M 7/12 (2013.01); H04Q 2213/1301 (2013.01); H04Q 2213/13034 (2013.01); H04Q 2213/1307 (2013.01); H04Q 2213/13093 (2013.01); H04Q 2213/13138 (2013.01); H04Q 2213/13204 (2013.01); H04Q 2213/1329 (2013.01); H04Q 2213/13298 (2013.01); H04Q 2213/13367 (2013.01); H04Q 2213/13389 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9740614 A1 19971030; AU 2382297 A 19971112; CA 2251988 A1 19971030; CA 2251988 C 20021022; DE 69722929 D1 20030724; DE 69722929 T2 20040506; DK 176239 B1 20070410; DK 47096 A 19971020; EP 0898832 A1 19990303; EP 0898832 B1 20030618; JP H11509704 A 19990824; US 2002141330 A1 20021003; US 6421340 B1 20020716

INPADOC legal status


2012-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100430

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100418

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090418

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101103

2011-01-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101230

2010-12-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100418

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090415

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090420

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090417

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080428

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-06-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040319

2004-04-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-12-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-09-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030929

2003-07-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69722929 P 20030724

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2003-06-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-06-18 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030618

2003-06-18 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030618

2003-01-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 04L 12/64 A, 7H 04M 3/42 B, 7H 04Q 3/00 B

1999-12-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: TELLABS DENMARK A/S

1999-03-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: CHRISTENSEN, LARS, GYLLING

1999-03-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981106

1999-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL