Global Patent Index - EP 0898908 A3

EP 0898908 A3 2000-01-05 - Brush making machine with up to three bristle magazines

Title (en)

Brush making machine with up to three bristle magazines

Title (de)

Bürstenherstellungsmaschine mit bis zu drei Borstenmagazinen

Title (fr)

Machine pour fabriquer des brosses avec jusqu'à trois magasins de soies

Publication

EP 0898908 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98115086 A

Priority

DE 29715117 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0898908A2] The device extracts fibre bunches from up to three fibre boxes (14,16,18). It has a bundle pick-up (10), a counter part (12), and a slide (20) moving between counter part and boxes. The slide has three channels (22,24,26) associated with the three boxes. The outer channels are angled towards the central channel. A pressure plunger (28,30) is positioned between the central box and the box on either side. The end face of each plunger facing the slide is supported on a side face of the slide, or pressure-charges the opposite end of one of the outer channels dependant upon the position of the slide.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A46D 3/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A46D 3/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A46D 3/082 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29715117 U1 19981224; EP 0898908 A2 19990303; EP 0898908 A3 20000105; EP 0898908 B1 20021106; ES 2186953 T3 20030516; US 6079788 A 20000627

INPADOC legal status


2013-09-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59806161

- Effective date: 20130301

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130301

2013-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120811

2011-12-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110824

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100812

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110826

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-10-19 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20111019

2009-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090821

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080831

2008-04-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20071018

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-03-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20071018

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-03-31 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030811

2003-10-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-08-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030811

2003-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2186953 T3

2003-03-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030304

2002-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806161 20021212

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB IT

2002-11-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-06-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020429

2000-09-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE ES GB IT

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000518

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB IT

1999-03-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI