Global patent index - EP 0898911 A3

EP 0898911 A3 2000-05-10 - Wooden chair with elastically mounted backrest

Title (en)

Wooden chair with elastically mounted backrest

Title (de)

Holzstuhl mit federnder Rückenlehne

Title (fr)

Chaise en bois avec dossier monté élastiquement

Publication

EP 0898911 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98115995 A

Priority

  • DE 19737061 A
  • DE 29808402 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0898911A2] Solid wooden support members (20) for the backrest are each split between seat surface and backrest, each half having hole (34, 36) drilled, to receive the spring member (28), with first portion (38, 40) having large diameter, about 25 mm long, and a second portion (42, 44) of smaller diameter, to receive the end of the spring member.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 7/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 7/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 7/448 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0898911 A2 19990303; EP 0898911 A3 20000510; DE 19737061 A1 19990311; DE 29808402 U1 19980910; DE 29824476 U1 20010712

INPADOC legal status

2001-09-27 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-08-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20001111

2001-01-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-03-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI