Global Patent Index - EP 0898915 A3

EP 0898915 A3 2002-09-25 - Carpet laying method

Title (en)

Carpet laying method

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Verlegen eines Teppichs

Title (fr)

Procédé de pose de moquette

Publication

EP 0898915 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98115400 A

Priority

  • DE 19735888 A
  • DE 19800272 A
  • DE 19812482 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0898915A2] Stretching tool (S) is used to stretch an edge section (3') of the carpet (3), which is looped fully on the underside, between first and second hook members (G) adhesively bonded to the floor (2). The edge section projects (X direction) over the second hook member and is fastened by means of a third hook member.A claim is also made for a stretching tool having a ribbed undersurface.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47G 27/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47G 27/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47G 27/0493 (2013.01); A47G 27/0437 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0898915 A2 19990303; EP 0898915 A3 20020925

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-02 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030326

2003-07-17 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-03-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI