Global Patent Index - EP 0898951 B1

EP 0898951 B1 2002-11-13 - Fluid access assembly and a method for preparing a syringe with a liquid drug

Title (en)

Fluid access assembly and a method for preparing a syringe with a liquid drug

Title (de)

Zugangsvorrichtung für eine Flüssigkeit und Verfahren um eine Spritze mit einer flüssigen Arznei zu füllen

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'accès vers un liquide et méthode pour remplir une sirenge avec un médicament liquide

Publication

EP 0898951 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 98115546 A

Priority

IL 12160597 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0898951A2] A fluid access assembly (1) for use with a syringe (4), a vial (6) having a stopper (8) or an ampoule (9,28,34,36) with a frangible end (10) and a sealed end (11), the assembly comprising a vial adapter (2) having a first cannula (12) with a proximal portion (13) for sealingly receiving the syringe and a distal portion (14) for puncturing the vial's stopper; and an ampoule adapter (3,26,28,32,37) having a second cannula (19,27,29) with a proximal portion (19A) initially sealingly and detachably mounted on the first cannula distal portion, the second cannula being dimensioned to abut against the previously opened ampoule's sealed end on its sliding onto said second cannula thereby enabling aspiration of its contents into the syringe, characterized in the ampoule adapter (3) having a body portion (18) with at least one pair of oppositely disposed gripping members (24,33,38) substantially co-directional and co-extensive with the second cannula for respectively receiving the ampoule's opened end therein and gripping opposite sides of at least the ampoule's lower portion towards its sealed end on said sliding. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61J 1/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61J 1/00 (2006.01); A61J 1/20 (2006.01); A61J 1/06 (2006.01); A61J 1/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61J 1/2096 (2013.01); A61J 1/065 (2013.01); A61J 1/1406 (2013.01); A61J 1/201 (2015.05)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0898951 A2 19990303; EP 0898951 A3 19991110; EP 0898951 B1 20021113; DE 69809352 D1 20021219; DE 69809352 T2 20030320; IL 121605 A 20010319; IL 121605 D0 19980208

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150831

2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160301

2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150818

2016-06-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160429

2016-04-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150818

2016-03-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69809352

2014-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140827

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140818

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140827

- Year of fee payment: 17

2003-11-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030814

2003-05-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69809352 20021219

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-11-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-11-13 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021113

2001-11-14 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: FLUID ACCESS ASSEMBLY AND A METHOD FOR PREPARING A SYRINGE WITH A LIQUID DRUG

2001-07-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010529

2000-07-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2000-04-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000218

1999-11-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-11-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-03-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI