Global Patent Index - EP 0899168 A3

EP 0899168 A3 2000-12-13 - Deformation structure for the protection of occupants in vehicles

Title (en)

Deformation structure for the protection of occupants in vehicles

Title (de)

Deformationsstruktur für den Insassenschutz in Fahrzeugen

Title (fr)

Structure déformable pour la protection des occupants de véhicules

Publication

EP 0899168 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98113489 A

Priority

DE 19736839 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0899168A2] The deformation structure consists of energy absorbing elements with cavity bodies between walls or other components. The cavity bodies are in the form of tube sectors (1) which are pre-deformed perpendicularly to their longitudinal axes (R). These are fitted parallel to the walls (2) individually in a predetermined order, in one or more layers. The degree of deformation is between 0.1% and 85% in terms of the clear width of the non-deformed tube in the direction of the deformation force.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60R 21/02; F16F 7/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60R 21/04 (2006.01); F16F 1/37 (2006.01); F16F 1/371 (2006.01); F16F 7/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F16F 7/121 (2013.01); B60R 21/04 (2013.01); F16F 1/37 (2013.01); F16F 1/371 (2013.01); B60R 21/0428 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0899168 A2 19990303; EP 0899168 A3 20001213; EP 0899168 B1 20030423; DE 19736839 A1 19990225; US 5997077 A 19991207

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080731

2009-05-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090331

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090203

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070706

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070731

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-04-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040126

2003-11-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031030

2003-10-22 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20030423

2003-05-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59808022 P 20030528

2003-04-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-04-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-04-23 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030423

2003-04-23 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030423

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-08-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010613

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-03-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI