Global Patent Index - EP 0899196 B1

EP 0899196 B1 2001-03-07 - Method for packaging compressed paper rolls wound on cores

Title (en)

Method for packaging compressed paper rolls wound on cores

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Verpacken von komprimierten, auf Kernen aufgerollten, Papierrollen

Title (fr)

Proçédé pour emballer des rouleaux de papier comprimés enroulés sur des mandrins

Publication

EP 0899196 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 98119846 A

Priority

  • EP 94202715 A
  • IT TO940562 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0691274A1] Apparatus and method for packing or packaging togheter rolls of paper that are wound on a core and compressed. The apparatus comprises a device (32) for carrying out a first continuos and progressive compression of each roll (1-5), and a second compressing device (36) receiving layers of compressed rolls and wherein a bundle is formed, which device subsequently carries out a further compression either of the whole bundle of rolls, or of a layer thereof at a time. <MATH>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 25/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 25/14 (2006.01); B65B 63/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 25/146 (2013.01); B65B 63/026 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0691274 A1 19960110; EP 0691274 B1 19990623; AT 181541 T 19990715; AT 199523 T 20010315; DE 691274 T1 19961107; DE 69419247 D1 19990729; DE 69426840 D1 20010412; EP 0899196 A1 19990303; EP 0899196 B1 20010307; ES 2091165 T1 19961101; ES 2091165 T3 19991001; ES 2134183 T1 19991001; ES 2134183 T3 20010801; GR 960300023 T1 19960531; IT 1266161 B1 19961223; IT TO940562 A1 19960109; IT TO940562 D0 19940708; PT 899196 E 20010830

INPADOC legal status


2004-10-29 [REG PT MP4A] REFUSAL OF NATIONAL PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20040728

2004-07-14 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20040227

2004-06-30 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2002-10-17 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20021017

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-09-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20020927

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-07-10 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2002-06-28 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20020628

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-05-08 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20010921

2002-01-23 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: PAPER CONVERTING MACHINE COMPANY

- Effective date: 20011128

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-21 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010921

2001-09-21 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010921

2001-09-21 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010921

2001-09-21 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010921

2001-09-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-08-03 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2134183 T3

2001-08-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-06-08 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010608

2001-06-08 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010608

2001-06-07 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010607

2001-06-07 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010607

2001-04-18 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2001-04-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69426840 20010412

2001-03-28 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: INTERPATENT ST.TECN. BREV.

2001-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-03-07 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 691274

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 19981023

2001-03-07 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010307

2001-03-07 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010307

2001-03-07 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010307

2001-03-07 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010307

2001-03-07 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010307

2001-03-07 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 19981023

2001-03-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 199523 T 20010315

2001-02-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC.

2001-01-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KIMBERLEY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC.

2000-07-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000602

1999-10-01 [REG ES BA2A] PROVISIONAL PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2134183 T1

1999-08-18 [K1C1] CORRECTION OF PATENT APPLICATION (TITLE PAGE) PUBLISHED

- Effective date: 19990303

1999-08-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KIMBERLY-CLARK TISSUE COMPANY

1999-07-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990429

1999-05-12 [ITCL] IT: TRANSLATION FOR EP CLAIMS FILED

- Representative's name: INTERPATENT ST.TECN. BREVETTUALE

1999-03-03 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 691274

1999-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-03-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 981023