Global patent index - EP 0899208 B1

EP 0899208 B1 2000-12-27 - Detergent tablets-package combination

Title (en)

Detergent tablets-package combination

Title (de)

Verpackungsvorrichtung für Reinigungsmitteltabletten

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'emballage de tablettes détergentes

Publication

EP 0899208 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97202674 A

Priority

EP 97202674 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0899208A1] The present invention provides the combination of packaging system comprising re-closing means with a stack of tablets (1) containing a bleaching agent unstable in a moisture environment, characterised in that the packaging device is having a Moisture Vapour Transfer Rate of less than 20g/m<2>/day measured at 40 DEG C and 75% eRH for avoiding ingress of water and may also have a micro-hole to allow gas release. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 75/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 75/06 (2006.01); B65D 75/58 (2006.01); B65D 75/08 (2006.01); B65D 75/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 75/58 (2013.01); B65D 75/06 (2013.01); B65D 75/5855 (2013.01); B65D 75/08 (2013.01); B65D 75/12 (2013.01); B65D 2565/388 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0899208 A1 19990303; EP 0899208 B1 20001227; BR 9812145 A 20000718; CA 2302329 A1 19990311; CA 2302329 C 20061107; CN 1278227 A 20001227; DE 69703795 D1 20010201; DE 69703795 T2 20010802; EP 1019299 A1 20000719; ES 2153158 T3 20010216; JP 2001514137 A 20010911; WO 9911540 A1 19990311

INPADOC legal status

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050809

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-12-03 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR2

- Effective date: 20061212

2007-10-17 [27W] REVOKED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27W

- Effective date: 20061212

2007-10-17 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPR

- Free Format Text: 20061212

2006-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060930

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-09-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060929

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-09-20 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060920

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-09-06 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060906

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-08-07 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060807

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-08-04 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060804

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-04-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: UNILEVER PLC

2006-02-15 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: UNILEVER PLC

- Effective date: 20010927

2002-02-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: UNILEVER PLC

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-11-28 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: UNILEVER PLC

- Effective date: 20010927

2001-02-20 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. C. GREGORJ S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-02-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2153158

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2001-02-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69703795

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-02-01

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2000-05-03 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2000-01-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19991117

1999-11-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

1999-10-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990809

1999-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL