Global Patent Index - EP 0899213 B1

EP 0899213 B1 2001-05-02 - Pump-type packaging unit for a liquid or semi-liquid product

Title (en)

Pump-type packaging unit for a liquid or semi-liquid product

Title (de)

Mit einer Pumpe versehene Verpackungseinheit für ein flüssiges oder halbflüssiges Produktes

Title (fr)

Ensemble de conditionnement d'un produit liquide ou semi liquide du type à pompe

Publication

EP 0899213 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98401861 A

Priority

FR 9710708 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0899213A2] The container has a pump (30) which is actuated by a pusher (34) with a thrust surface (48). The pusher is connected to the outlet (9) by a flexible tube (41) so that the outlet remains fixed relative to the container (10) when the pump is operated. The liquid product is held in a reservoir (12) inside the container.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 83/16; B05B 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 83/76 (2006.01); B05B 11/00 (2006.01); B65D 83/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 83/206 (2013.01); B05B 11/0056 (2013.01); B05B 11/3015 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0899213 A2 19990303; EP 0899213 A3 19990707; EP 0899213 B1 20010502; DE 69800746 D1 20010607; DE 69800746 T2 20010830; ES 2158651 T3 20010901; FR 2767799 A1 19990305; FR 2767799 B1 20000512; JP 2986459 B2 19991206; JP H11124189 A 19990511; US 6089410 A 20000718; US RE44710 E 20140121

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-21 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69800746

2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170720

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170801

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170719

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170719

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170613

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-06-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-06-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2002-04-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2158651 T3

2001-08-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010724

2001-06-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69800746 20010607

2001-05-11 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-01-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001122

2000-03-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-03-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000107

1999-07-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-07-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-05-12 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

1999-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-03-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI