Global patent index - EP 0899230 B1

EP 0899230 B1 2001-03-14 - Method for controlling an intermediate stacking device for flat mail objects

Title (en)

Method for controlling an intermediate stacking device for flat mail objects

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Steuerung eines Zwischenstaplers von flachen Sendungen

Title (fr)

Méthode pour contrôler un dispositif d'empilage intermédiaire d' objets postaux plats

Publication

EP 0899230 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98115719 A

Priority

DE 19737857 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19737857C1] The control method involves interrupting the normal operating mode of the stacking device when no letters have been extracted from the letter stack for a defined time interval. This also involves the blocking of further letters and stopping of the underfloor conveyor band (UB) on which the letters are supported, transverse to their movement direction. The stacking carriage (SW) is displaced in the direction of the letter separation device for detecting the filling level of the stack, from its compression movement, with re-instating of the operation of the stacking device when the extraction of a letter from the stack is detected.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 29/50; B07C 1/02; B65H 1/24; B65H 3/02; B65H 31/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 1/02 (2006.01); B65H 1/14 (2006.01); B65H 1/30 (2006.01); B65H 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 1/025 (2013.01); B65H 1/30 (2013.01); B65H 3/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19737857 C1 19981210; EP 0899230 A2 19990303; EP 0899230 A3 19990526; EP 0899230 B1 20010314; US 6179283 B1 20010130

INPADOC legal status

2012-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110831

2012-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110820

2012-05-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20120430

2011-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-06-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59800525

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110223

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110217

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091019

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-03-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-07-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-06-05 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-04-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59800525

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-04-19

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2000-06-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000427

2000-02-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR IT

1999-08-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990618

1999-05-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-05-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

1999-03-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI