Global Patent Index - EP 0899320 B1

EP 0899320 B1 2002-11-06 - Process and hydrotreatment unit for petroleum charges comprising ammonia cracking and hydrogen recycle

Title (en)

Process and hydrotreatment unit for petroleum charges comprising ammonia cracking and hydrogen recycle

Title (de)

Hydroraffinierungsverfahren und -anlage für Erdöleinsätze mit Ammoniakspaltung und Wasserstoffrückführung

Title (fr)

Procédé et unité d'hydrotraitement d'une charge pétrolière comprenant le craquage de l'ammoniac et le recyclage de l'hydrogène dans l'unité

Publication

EP 0899320 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98402040 A

Priority

FR 9710679 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0899320A1] Oil hydrotreatment comprises recycling of hydrogen within the unit by cooling the cracking effluent to an appropriate temperature, recovering a gaseous phase containing nitrogen, hydrogen and hydrogen sulfide, extracting the hydrogen sulfide and passing the remaining gas through a hydrogen recovery unit. The hydrotreatment of a hydrocarbon batch containing sulfur and nitrogen in the presence of a catalyst allows the recovery of hydrotreated hydrocarbon, a high pressure purge gas containing hydrogen sulfide and light hydrocarbons and a first effluent containing water and ammonium sulfide. This effluent is purified in a catalytic cracker heated to 1000-1400 degrees C to produce a cracker effluent containing hydrogen, hydrogen sulfide and nitrogen and this is cooled to allow recovery of the hydrogen. The high pressure purge gas is sent to the hydrocarbon extraction unit to produce a gas rich in hydrogen sulfide and a gaseous phase clear of hydrogen sulfide. The cracker effluent is cooled to between 30-100 degrees C in a heat exchanger in a time of between 1-5 seconds. The first effluent and the cooled effluent are compressed to 2-10 MPa, compatible with the hydrogen sulfide extraction unit, which is a high pressure amine extraction unit. The hydrogen recovery unit is a membrane permeation unit. The aqueous phase is also recycled.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10G 49/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10G 49/00 (2006.01); C10G 49/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10G 49/007 (2013.01); C10G 49/22 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0899320 A1 19990303; EP 0899320 B1 20021106; CA 2243626 A1 19990225; DE 69809159 D1 20021212; DE 69809159 T2 20030320; ES 2186985 T3 20030516; FR 2767529 A1 19990226; FR 2767529 B1 19991008; US 6096195 A 20000801

INPADOC legal status


2005-11-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040813

2005-08-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050812

2005-05-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050301

2005-04-06 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040812

2005-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050301

2005-03-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050301

2004-08-13 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040813

2004-08-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040812

2003-10-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-09-01 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030901

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030831

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-08-06 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030806

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-07-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030730

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2186985 T3

2003-03-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030214

2002-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69809159 20021212

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT NL

2002-11-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-01-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011218

1999-11-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES GB IT NL

1999-11-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990903

1999-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT NL

1999-03-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI