Global Patent Index - EP 0899325 B1

EP 0899325 B1 2001-12-19 - Fabric softener composition

Title (en)

Fabric softener composition

Title (de)

Weichspülmittelzusammemsetzung

Title (fr)

Composition adoucissante pour textiles

Publication

EP 0899325 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98810753 A

Priority

  • EP 98810753 A
  • EP 97810573 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0899325A2] Fabric conditioner formulation contains (a) a water-soluble zinc (Zn), iron(II) (Fe-II), calcium (Ca), magnesium (Mg), sodium (Na), potassium (K), aluminum (Al), silicon(IV) (Si-IV), phosphorus(V) (P-V), titanium(IV) (Ti-IV), germanium(IV) (Ge-IV), chromium(VI) (Cr-VI), gallium(III) (Ga-III), zirconium(IV) (Zr-IV), indium(III) (In-III), tin(IV) (Sn-IV)or hafnium(IV) (Hf-IV) phthalocyanine and (b) a quaternium ammonium compound of formula R1R2-N<+)<B)-A (I); in which R1, R2 = 1-5 carbon (C) (hydroxy)alkyl; A = a group of formula (IIA) or (IIB); B = 1-5 C alkyl, 8-20 C fatty acyl or a (IIA) or (IIB) group; R3, R4, R5 = an 8-20 C fatty acyl; X1<-> = an anion compatible for conditioners; m, n, p = 0-5. Also claimed is a method of bleaching textile fiber materials with a photobleaching agent in a bath containing this formulation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/00; C11D 1/62; C11D 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06L 3/04 (2006.01); C09K 3/16 (2006.01); C11D 1/62 (2006.01); C11D 3/00 (2006.01); C11D 3/02 (2006.01); C11D 3/395 (2006.01); C11D 3/42 (2006.01); D06L 3/12 (2006.01); D06M 13/02 (2006.01); D06M 13/244 (2006.01); D06M 13/248 (2006.01); D06M 13/256 (2006.01); D06M 13/282 (2006.01); D06M 13/322 (2006.01); D06M 13/35 (2006.01); D06M 13/46 (2006.01); D06M 13/463 (2006.01); D06M 13/50 (2006.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

C11D (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/62 (2013.01); C11D 3/0015 (2013.01); C11D 3/0063 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0899325 A2 19990303; EP 0899325 A3 19990721; EP 0899325 B1 20011219; AU 747856 B2 20020523; AU 8000698 A 19990225; BR 9803753 A 19991207; DE 59802506 D1 20020131; ES 2169492 T3 20020701; ID 20699 A 19990218; JP H11172575 A 19990629; NZ 331196 A 20000128; US 6583105 B1 20030624; ZA 9807302 B 19990215

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130807

2014-09-09 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140909

2014-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130902

2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130806

2014-06-05 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59802506

- Effective date: 20140301

2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130806

2014-05-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140430

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140301

2014-04-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130806

2013-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120928

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121031

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120828

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120914

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120831

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-04-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-04-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-03-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-10-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090605

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-05-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: CIBA HOLDING INC.

- Free text: CIBA SPECIALTY CHEMICALS HOLDING INC.#KLYBECKSTRASSE 141#4057 BASEL (CH) -TRANSFER TO- CIBA HOLDING INC.#KLYBECKSTRASSE 141#4057 BASEL (CH)

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *CIBA SPECIALTY CHEMICALS HOLDING INC.

- Effective date: 20040831

2005-05-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050301

2005-03-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050301

2005-02-28 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *CIBA SPECIALTY CHEMICALS HOLDING INC.

- Effective date: 20040831

2004-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040831

2003-10-09 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20031009

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-07-04 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030704

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2169492 T3

2002-05-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-04-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020319

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802506 20020131

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2000-07-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000524

2000-03-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

1999-09-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990719

1999-07-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-07-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

1999-03-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI