Global Patent Index - EP 0899369 A3

EP 0899369 A3 2000-03-01 - Fabric take-down roller device for flat bed knitting machines

Title (en)

Fabric take-down roller device for flat bed knitting machines

Title (de)

Warenabzugswalzenanordnung für Flachstrickmaschinen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de rouleaux de tirage d'articles pour des métiers à tricoter rectilignes

Publication

EP 0899369 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98113354 A

Priority

DE 19738013 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0899369A2] The fabric take-off roller assembly, for a flatbed knitter, is in sections (16) keyed together at the end sides (21,22) by rim gears (38) facing each other. A toothed wheel (15), at a support carrier (17), keys them together. The linkage mounting, for the axially adjacent roller sections (16), is through the teeth of the toothed wheel (15) and/or the rim gears (38) of the roller sections which are curved across the periphery and cambered on a longitudinal section. The toothed wheel unit (15) has two neighboring cogwheels (23,24) keyed together, of the same dia., with the support carrier (17) between them. Their teeth have an identical curvature and camber. The two cogwheels (23,24) have complementary lugs at their axial ends, to lock together, and they are clamped together axially. A radial roller bearing is at the support carrier (17), between the roller sections (16), where the inner race of the bearing is clamped between the two cogwheels (23,24), and the outer race is keyed to the support carrier (17). The support carrier (17) swings on a rigid longitudinal axis (18) along the length of the take-off roller assembly (11), parallel to it, which has mountings at intervals for the support carriers (17). The mountings are recesses for locking disks (34). The support carriers (17) are flat units which are inserted into the whole gap between adjacent roller sections (16). The end of the support carrier (17) has a deflecting projection (67), away from the axis mounting (18), and a lateral covering web member (68) at its outer edge between the mounting and the facing counter roller. Each support carrier (17) has an individual and adjustable sleeve with a scale as a tensioner, to apply a force in the swing direction, and has a cam (61) to take the pressure. The end of the support carrier (17), over the roller section (16), has a projection (66) to limit the swing movement.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04B 15/90

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04B 15/88 (2006.01); D04B 15/90 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04B 15/90 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0899369 A2 19990303; EP 0899369 A3 20000301; EP 0899369 B1 20030409; DE 19738013 A1 19990304; ES 2194258 T3 20031116; JP 4120729 B2 20080716; JP H11181658 A 19990706; US 5960646 A 19991005

INPADOC legal status


2012-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110717

2010-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100729

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070201

2005-10-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040719

2005-09-19 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050919

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-07-19 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040719

2004-03-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040112

2003-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2194258 T3

2003-07-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030728

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-04-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

2000-11-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES IT

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000728

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

1999-03-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI