Global Patent Index - EP 0899388 A3

EP 0899388 A3 2000-08-23 - Building method for family-houses and dwelling buildings

Title (en)

Building method for family-houses and dwelling buildings

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Erstellung von Einfamilien-Wohngebäuden und Wohngebäude

Title (fr)

Procédé de construction pour maisons familiales et bâtiments d'habitation

Publication

EP 0899388 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98115950 A

Priority

DE 29715503 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0899388A2] The structure has fastener for profiled supports. The fasteners are inserted before filling in the floor at the points forming a square. Horizontally aligned plates are provided on the top ends of the profiled supports to support and/or fix horizontally aligned chord connectors (10) formed as profiled parts such as double T-shaped supports. Plates (14,15) aligned parallel or perpendicular to the longitudinal extension of the chord connectors (10) are provided on same to fix adjoining connectors in the upper area of the profiled supports. Further plates (16) aligned inclined to the longitudinal extension of the connectors are provided in the end areas of same to tension and/or align the connectors and the supports during assembly and/or during use of the building.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 1/24; E04H 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/24 (2006.01); E04H 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/24 (2013.01); E04H 1/02 (2013.01); E04B 2001/2415 (2013.01); E04B 2001/2448 (2013.01); E04B 2001/249 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29715503 U1 19971218; EP 0899388 A2 19990303; EP 0899388 A3 20000823

INPADOC legal status


2001-10-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010305

2001-05-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 04B 1/24 A, 7E 04H 1/02 B

1999-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

1999-03-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI