Global Patent Index - EP 0899396 B1

EP 0899396 B1 2002-11-06 - Floor covering with individually assembled plates

Title (en)

Floor covering with individually assembled plates

Title (de)

Fussbodenbelag aus einzeln zusammengefügten Platten

Title (fr)

Revêtement de sol en plaques assemblées individuellement

Publication

EP 0899396 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98115760 A

Priority

DE 29715179 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0899396A2] The plates (1) have on their underneath supporting elements (3) whereby a centering part (2) fixed in the floor (B) engages between the supporting elements of one plate which is then locked in the horizontal direction. The supporting elements can be directly supported on the floor. They can be seized at the sides by the bearing faces of the centring member which have associated rear-cut section. The supporting elements can have cylindrical outer contours (10) interacting with suitable shaped bearing faces (9) of the centring part.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04F 15/10; A47G 27/04; E01C 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04F 15/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 15/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29715179 U1 19971211; AT 227384 T 20021115; EP 0899396 A2 19990303; EP 0899396 A3 19990630; EP 0899396 B1 20021106

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-21 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050821

2004-06-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-05-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040301

2004-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-04-14 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2004-03-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040302

2004-03-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040301

2003-10-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-08-21 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-08-21 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-04-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-12-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021130

2002-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806163 20021212

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT NL

2002-11-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 227384 T 20021115

2002-05-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020403

2001-10-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: FIRMA HERMANN FRIEDRICH KUENNE GMBH & CO.

2001-10-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SEISS, HELMUTH

2000-03-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FR GB IT NL

1999-09-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990716

1999-06-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-06-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT NL

1999-03-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI