Global Patent Index - EP 0899425 A3

EP 0899425 A3 2000-07-05 - Gas turbine blade

Title (en)

Gas turbine blade

Title (de)

Turbinenschaufel einer Gasturbine

Title (fr)

Aube pour une turbine à gaz

Publication

EP 0899425 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98810770 A

Priority

DE 19738065 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0899425A2] A cooling system for a gas turbine blade has two sets of cooling ducts; a closed set of ducts (10) which cools the rear part of the blade and an open set of ducts (11) which cools the leading part of the blade. The closed ducts are supplied with a cooling fluid, which can be steam. The open ducts are supplied with air or steam, and the cooling flow is guided over the suction side (4) of the blade via tangential exit vents (22). Other cooling vents (25) are on the leading edge of the blade. The closed ducts are linked at set points, to maintain a good circulation, even with part of a duct blocked. Likewise the two ducts of the open cooling system are linked by connecting ducts (18) spaced along the blade.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01D 5/18; F02C 7/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 5/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01D 5/187 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0899425 A2 19990303; EP 0899425 A3 20000705; EP 0899425 B1 20031203; CN 1120287 C 20030903; CN 1211667 A 19990324; DE 19738065 A1 19990304; JP H11132003 A 19990518; US 6033181 A 20000307

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170811

2018-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20180301

2018-04-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20170811

2018-03-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59810315

2017-09-20 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20170824 AND 20170830

2017-09-19 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ANSALDO ENERGIA IP UK LIMITED, GB

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: GENERAL ELECTRIC TECHNOLOGY GMBH, BADEN, CH

- Document: DE 59810315

2017-09-19 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59810315

- Representative's name: ROESLER, UWE, DIPL.-PHYS.UNIV., DE

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160822

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160819

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-09 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GENERAL ELECTRIC TECHNOLOGY GMBH, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD., BADEN, CH

- Document: DE 59810315

2016-08-09 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ANSALDO ENERGIA IP UK LIMITED, GB

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD., BADEN, CH

- Document: DE 59810315

2016-08-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59810315

- Representative's name: ROESLER, UWE, DIPL.-PHYS.UNIV., DE

2004-11-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040906

2004-05-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040415

2004-01-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59810315 P 20040115

2004-01-14 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD

2003-12-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2003-12-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM (SWITZERLAND) LTD

2002-08-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020701

2002-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM

2001-03-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE GB

2001-01-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ABB (SCHWEIZ) AG

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001027

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE GB

1999-03-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI