Global Patent Index - EP 0899464 A3

EP 0899464 A3 2000-06-28 - Hydraulic servomotor control assembly

Title (en)

Hydraulic servomotor control assembly

Title (de)

Hydraulisches Aggregat zur Regelung eines Servomotors

Title (fr)

Ensemble hydraulique de régulation d'un servomoteur

Publication

EP 0899464 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98116235 A

Priority

JP 25126797 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0899464A2] A hydraulic servomotor control assembly is disclosed, for example a hydraulic servomotor control assembly which supplies the pressurized oil as operating fluid to a hydraulic motor 1, and which controls the volume of the pressurized fluid by means of a servo valve 2. In hydraulic servomotors of the prior art, the hydraulic motor and the tachogenerator or rotational speed sensor device for detecting the rotation, are two separate entities, so that the servomotor must be quite large, and it is difficult to find ways to make it any smaller. In contrast to such prior art, the hydraulic servomotor control assembly according to this invention is distinguished by the fact that a hydraulic motor 1 and a rotational speed detector device (13, 17, 20) are shaft coupled and integral with each other, so that the resulting assembly is both compact and stable. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 15/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F15B 13/043 (2006.01); F15B 9/14 (2006.01); F15B 15/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 9/14 (2013.01); F15B 15/2815 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0899464 A2 19990303; EP 0899464 A3 20000628; CA 2246210 A1 19990301; JP H1182417 A 19990326

INPADOC legal status


2006-01-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050705

2003-04-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030307

2001-03-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-02-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001220

2000-07-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 15B 15/28 A, 7F 15B 9/14 B

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-03-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI