Global Patent Index - EP 0899514 A3

EP 0899514 A3 2001-03-21 - Nestable expansion vessel

Title (en)

Nestable expansion vessel

Title (de)

Ineinander stapelbares Druckausgleichsgefäss

Title (fr)

Vase d'expansion empilable

Publication

EP 0899514 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98101719 A

Priority

  • DE 19737911 A
  • DE 19739143 A
  • DE 19749018 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0899514A2] The upper part (12) and the lower part (16) are separated from each other and can be stacked one in the other for transport and storage. At location they can be releasably connected with one another by clamp devices (14). The clamp device is a tension ring, which can be brought to the lock position by a tension lever. The tension ring has a U-shaped leg, provided with axially inwardly directed inclines running one onto the other. The upper and lower parts have radially outwardly directed borders (19,20) on their facing inner edges (25,26).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24D 3/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24D 3/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24D 3/1016 (2013.01); F24D 3/1008 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0899514 A2 19990303; EP 0899514 A3 20010321; CZ 9802518 A3 19990317; PL 328211 A1 19990215

INPADOC legal status


2002-04-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010922

2002-01-24 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-12-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-03-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI