Global Patent Index - EP 0899522 A3

EP 0899522 A3 2000-03-22 - Device for preventing compressor damage due to oil shortage at very low suction temperatures, particularly for vehicle refrigeration compressors

Title (en)

Device for preventing compressor damage due to oil shortage at very low suction temperatures, particularly for vehicle refrigeration compressors

Title (de)

Einrichting zur Verhinderung von Kompressorschäden insbesondere bei Kompressoren für Fahrzeugkühlung durch Ölmangel bei sehr tiefen Ansaugtemperaturen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour prévenir des dégâts de compresseur causés par manque d'huile à des températures d'aspiration très basses, en particulier pour des compresseurs de réfrigération de véhicules

Publication

EP 0899522 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98105427 A

Priority

DE 19737671 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0899522A2] The arrangement has a branch (5) from the liquid delivery line (4) before the injection valve (6) which leads into a magnetic blocking valve (8) which is closed in the no-current state. A connecting line (9) after the evaporator (7) leading to the suction line (9) contains a choke element (10).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25B 49/02; B60H 1/32; F25B 31/00; F25B 41/04; F25B 49/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25B 31/00 (2006.01); F25B 41/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25B 41/04 (2013.01); F25B 31/002 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0899522 A2 19990303; EP 0899522 A3 20000322; DE 19737671 A1 19990304

INPADOC legal status


2003-04-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20021002

2000-11-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-09 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: KERSTNER, RALPH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP3

2000-08-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: THOMAE, RUDOLF, DIPL.-ING.

2000-08-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: KERSTNER, RALPH

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000516

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 25B 49/02 A, 7F 25B 41/04 B, 7F 25B 49/00 B, 7F 25B 31/00 B, 7B 60H 1/32 B

1999-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-03-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI