Global patent index - EP 0899523 A3

EP 0899523 A3 2000-01-12 - Refrigerator with cool air distributing device

Title (en)

Refrigerator with cool air distributing device

Title (de)

Kühlschrank mit Kühlluftverteilvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Réfrigérateur à dispositif de distribution d'air froid

Publication

EP 0899523 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98306879 A

Priority

  • KR 19970044864 A
  • KR 19970044865 A
  • KR 19970044874 A
  • KR 19970048580 A
  • KR 19970048581 A
  • KR 19970050535 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0899523A2] Disclosed is a refrigerator a device (30) for dispersing cool air. In a duct (15) of a cooling compartment (3) is installed a horizontal dispersing blade (43) of planar plate shape, which is rotatable around a vertical axis. The blade (43) disperses cool air horizontally. In the duct (15) are installed a cam (53) rotatable around a horizontal axis, and a motor (59) for rotating the cam (53). The rotation of the cam (53) is converted to the reciprocal rotation of the blade (43) by a transmission part (69). Thus, while the cam (53) is rotated by the motor (59), the cool air is dispersed horizontally in the compartment (3), and the temperature in the compartment (3) is maintained uniform. Further, if the cam (5) is stopped, the cool air can be concentrated on a specific area. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25D 11/00; F24F 13/10; F25D 17/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25D 17/08 (2006.01); F25D 17/04 (2006.01); F25D 17/06 (2006.01); F24F 13/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25D 17/065 (2013.01); F25D 17/045 (2013.01); F24F 2013/1473 (2013.01); F24F 2221/48 (2013.01); F25D 2317/0653 (2013.01); F25D 2317/0672 (2013.01); F25D 2317/0682 (2013.01); F25D 2400/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0899523 A2 19990303; EP 0899523 A3 20000112; CN 1211717 A 19990324; JP H11132627 A 19990521

INPADOC legal status

2001-04-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20000713

2000-10-26 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2000-09-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-03-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI