Global Patent Index - EP 0899525 A3

EP 0899525 A3 2000-01-12 - Refrigerator having a cool air dispersing device

Title (en)

Refrigerator having a cool air dispersing device

Title (de)

Kühlschrank mit Kühlluftverteilvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Réfrigérateur comportant un dispositif de distribution d'air froid

Publication

EP 0899525 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98306883 A

Priority

  • KR 19970042264 A
  • KR 19970042265 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0899525A2] A refrigerator haS a cool air dispersing device (30) capable of dispersing cool air horizontally and vertically. Planar cool air dispersing blades (41a, 41b, 41c) direct cool air through apertures (16) into a cooling chamber (3). Each planar blade (41a, 41b, 41c) has at least one auxiliary blade (51) for dispersing cool air vertically. The auxiliary blades (51) are semi-disc-shaped and can have their angles of inclination manually varied. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25D 11/00; F24F 13/10; F25D 17/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25D 17/08 (2006.01); F24F 13/075 (2006.01); F25D 17/04 (2006.01); F25D 17/06 (2006.01); F24F 13/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24F 13/075 (2013.01); F25D 17/045 (2013.01); F25D 17/065 (2013.01); F24F 13/1426 (2013.01); F25D 2317/0672 (2013.01); F25D 2317/0682 (2013.01); F25D 2400/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0899525 A2 19990303; EP 0899525 A3 20000112; CN 1210245 A 19990310; JP H11132628 A 19990521; KR 100482002 B1 20050331

INPADOC legal status


2001-04-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20000713

2000-10-26 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2000-09-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-03-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI