Global patent index - EP 0899526 A3

EP 0899526 A3 2000-01-12 - Refrigerator with cool air distributing means

Title (en)

Refrigerator with cool air distributing means

Title (de)

Kühlschrank mit Kühlluftverteilungsmitteln

Title (fr)

Réfrigérateur avec des moyens de distribution d'air froid

Publication

EP 0899526 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98306907 A

Priority

  • KR 19970042262 A
  • KR 19970042266 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0899526A2] Cool air is supplied to the food compartment (3) of a refrigerator through a plurality of apertures (16) in the rear wall of the food compartment (3). Behind each aperture is a plurality of blades (51) that are reciprocated about respective horizontal axes in such a way that they remain plane parallel to each other. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25D 11/00; F24F 13/15; F25D 17/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25D 17/08 (2006.01); F24F 13/075 (2006.01); F25D 17/04 (2006.01); F24F 13/14 (2006.01); F25D 17/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25D 17/045 (2013.01); F24F 13/075 (2013.01); F24F 2013/1473 (2013.01); F24F 2221/48 (2013.01); F25D 17/065 (2013.01); F25D 2317/0653 (2013.01); F25D 2317/0672 (2013.01); F25D 2317/0682 (2013.01); F25D 2400/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0899526 A2 19990303; EP 0899526 A3 20000112; CN 1210248 A 19990310; JP H11118319 A 19990430; KR 100482003 B1 20050331

INPADOC legal status

2001-04-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20000713

2000-10-26 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2000-09-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-03-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI