Global Patent Index - EP 0899531 B1

EP 0899531 B1 2002-12-11 - Plate-like heat exchanger, more particularly oil cooler

Title (en)

Plate-like heat exchanger, more particularly oil cooler

Title (de)

Plattenwärmetauscher, insbesondere Ölkühler

Title (fr)

Echangeur de chaleur à plaques, en particulier refroidisseur d'huile

Publication

EP 0899531 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98890182 A

Priority

AT 144197 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0899531A2] The border webs (3) of heat exchange plate (2) which forms flow tanks (1) has aperture (12) for flow of heat exchange medium. The border (3) are mutually coupled through a connection tank (9) which is provided with discharge conduits (10,11), outwardly. Several flow tanks (1) are mutually coupled through apertures (5,12) for flow of heat exchange media. The heat exchange plates (2) forming the flow tanks (1), have border web (13) which are respectively extended around.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28D 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F28F 3/00 (2006.01); F28D 9/00 (2006.01); F28F 3/04 (2006.01); F28F 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28D 9/0037 (2013.01); F28D 9/0043 (2013.01); F28D 2021/0049 (2013.01); F28F 2250/104 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0899531 A2 19990303; EP 0899531 A3 19991201; EP 0899531 B1 20021211; AT 404987 B 19990426; AT A144197 A 19980815; DE 59806602 D1 20030123; ES 2189126 T3 20030701; JP H11159989 A 19990615; US 6026894 A 20000222

INPADOC legal status


2010-07-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080626

2009-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080626

2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080630

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080625

2009-08-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080626

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080625

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090101

2009-04-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090228

2009-02-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080625

2009-02-17 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070626

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070528

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070625

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-06-13 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070613

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-06-11 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20070611

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-06-06 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070606

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-12-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030912

2003-08-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2189126 T3

2003-04-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030315

2003-01-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806602 20030123

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2002-12-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-06-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020429

2000-08-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-06-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000425

1999-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-12-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

1999-03-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI