Global patent index - EP 0899701 A3

EP 0899701 A3 2000-01-12 - Motion and direction selective detector

Title (en)

Motion and direction selective detector

Title (de)

Bewegungs- und richtungsselektiver Bewegungsmelder

Title (fr)

Détecteur sélectif de mouvement et de direction

Publication

EP 0899701 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98111593 A

Priority

DE 19737761 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0899701A2] The detector includes a first, fixed, and permanently active detection system (1) consisting of several modules (2), each supervising an angular area (11) as part of a total supervision area. A second, movable, and temporarily active detection system (6) is revolving, at least around a vertical axis (A) by an electric drive. A control arrangement (8) forms control signals for the drive based on message signals from at least one of the detection systems.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08B 13/193

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08B 13/193 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08B 13/193 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0899701 A2 19990303; EP 0899701 A3 20000112; DE 19737761 A1 19990304; NO 983967 D0 19980828

INPADOC legal status

2002-07-24 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20020510

2001-10-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: ABB PATENT GMBH

2000-09-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE FI LI NL SE

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000427

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FI LI NL SE

1999-03-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI