Global Patent Index - EP 0899750 A3

EP 0899750 A3 2000-05-24 - High frequency coaxial cable

Title (en)

High frequency coaxial cable

Title (de)

Koaxiales Hochfrequenz-Kabel

Title (fr)

Câble coaxial à haute fréquence

Publication

EP 0899750 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98401975 A

Priority

DE 19737759 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0899750A2] The cable is composed of an inner conductor (1), of a surrounding dielectric material (2) which contains a mineral material as a spacer, and of a tubular outer conductor (3) lying over the dielectric material and arranged concentrically to the inner conductor. The spacer consists of a combination of a mineral- and thermoplastic insulation material.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01B 11/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01B 11/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01B 11/1834 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 198117, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class A85, AN 1981-29686D, XP002134130
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 013, no. 270 (E - 776) 21 June 1989 (1989-06-21)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0899750 A2 19990303; EP 0899750 A3 20000524; AU 8083698 A 19990311; BR 9803270 A 19991019; DE 19737759 A1 19990304; US 6346671 B1 20020212

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040302

2001-01-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE DE FI FR GB IT

2000-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001013

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FI FR GB IT

1999-03-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI