Global Patent Index - EP 0899818 A3

EP 0899818 A3 2000-05-31 - Electric terminal, in particular for use with printed circuit boards

Title (en)

Electric terminal, in particular for use with printed circuit boards

Title (de)

Elektrische Anschlussklemme, insbesondere für den Einsatz auf Leiterplatten

Title (fr)

Borne de connexion électrique, notamment pour utilisation sur des plaques de circuits imprimés

Publication

EP 0899818 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98115981 A

Priority

DE 19736739 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0899818A2] The connector has a box spring element with a clamp arm cut out of its wall and bent inwards. An actuator part (4) has a cable (2) through channel which extends from a cable input opening (10) at a press end (35) to a cable outlet opening at the inner end of the actuator part.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 9/09; H01R 4/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/48 (2006.01); H01R 9/16 (2006.01); H01R 12/51 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/4836 (2013.01); H01R 12/515 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0899818 A2 19990303; EP 0899818 A3 20000531; EP 0899818 B1 20021127; AT 228722 T 20021215; DE 19736739 A1 19990304; DE 19838008 A1 19990325; DE 19838008 B4 20041209; DK 0899818 T3 20030303; ES 2184181 T3 20030401

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160825

2017-04-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 228722 T

- Effective date: 20160825

2017-04-05 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160901

2017-03-20 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20160831

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161029

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160819

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160825

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160825

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160825

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160831

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160830

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20150824

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20150824

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-09-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20150824

- Year of fee payment: 18

2009-07-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: SCHMAUDER & PARTNER AG PATENT- UND MARKENANWAELTE VSP;ZWAENGIWEG 7;8038 ZUERICH (CH)

2003-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-06-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-04-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030311

2003-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2184181 T3

2003-03-03 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-01-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806416 20030109

2002-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SCHMAUDER & PARTNER AG PATENTANWALTSBUERO

2002-11-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2002-11-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 228722 T 20021215

2002-11-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01R 12/32 A, 7H 01R 4/48 B

2002-10-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PHOENIX CONTACT GMBH & CO. KG

2001-09-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010802

2001-02-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001130

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

1999-03-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI