Global Patent Index - EP 0899820 A3

EP 0899820 A3 2000-10-04 - Fuseholders

Title (en)

Fuseholders

Title (de)

Sicherungshalter

Title (fr)

Porte-fusible

Publication

EP 0899820 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98302950 A

Priority

GB 9714457 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: GB2327158A] An electrical fuse-holder 16 comprises an insulating plastics housing 26, having a cavity 28 for a fuse 30, connectors (32, 34 Figure 6) mounted in the housing electrically connecting the fuse to a terminal block 14, the block 14 and the holder 16 being adapted so that the holder can be plugged into the block through apertures 24a, 24b either way round, relative to an axis 25 of the holder 16. The portion (26a Figure 2) of the housing formed with the cavity is located wholly to one side of said axis, whereby two adjacent holders, plugged opposite ways round into adjacent blocks become stacked together so that said portion of each fuse is located to one side of the corresponding portion of the other holder, thereby minimising the thickness of the stack. The connectors (32, 34) are located in the holder which is closed off by a living hinge (38). An aperture 26e allows cooling air to circulate around the holder. End plates 18 for the holders are provided. The terminal block 14 is mounted on a rail 12.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 9/26; H01H 85/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 85/20 (2006.01); H01R 9/26 (2006.01); H01H 85/47 (2006.01); H01H 85/56 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 85/2045 (2013.01); H01R 9/265 (2013.01); H01H 85/47 (2013.01); H01H 85/56 (2013.01); H01H 2085/209 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

GB 2327158 A 19990113; GB 2327158 B 19990922; GB 9714457 D0 19970910; DE 69825375 D1 20040909; DE 69825375 T2 20051222; EP 0899820 A2 19990303; EP 0899820 A3 20001004; EP 0899820 B1 20040804

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160421

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160421

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160420

- Year of fee payment: 19

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2005-07-29 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2005-07-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050506

2005-01-14 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: DAS PATENT IST AUFGRUND DES WEITERBEHANDLUNGSANTRAGS VOM 21.12. 2004 REAKTIVIERT WORDEN.

2005-01-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2004-09-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69825375 P 20040909

2004-08-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-08-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2004-08-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-08-04 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040804

2004-08-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040804

2004-06-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: WEIDMUELLER INTERFACE GMBH & CO. KG

2001-06-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001101

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01R 9/26 A, 7H 01H 85/20 B

1999-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

1999-03-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI