Global Patent Index - EP 0900035 B1

EP 0900035 B1 2002-11-06 - CHAIR WITH A SYNCHRONISATION MECHANISM

Title (en)

CHAIR WITH A SYNCHRONISATION MECHANISM

Title (de)

STUHL MIT SYNCHRONMECHANIK

Title (fr)

CHAISE A MECANISME DE SYNCHRONISATION

Publication

EP 0900035 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98903022 A

Priority

  • DE 19702328 A
  • EP 9800342 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19702328A1] A chair with a synchronisation mechanism comprises a seat (7) that can swivel around a swivelling axis (5) and a backrest support (11) that can swivel around a swivelling axis (9). The seat (7) and backrest support (11) are coupled by an articulated coupling (15) such that their inclination is simultaneously altered. The synchronisation ratio, i.e. the coupled inclination alteration ratio of the seat and backrest can be modified and individually adjusted, for example by shifting the bearing point of the articulated coupling (15) on the seat (7) or backrest support (11).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 1/032

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 1/032 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 1/03255 (2013.01); A47C 1/03294 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19702328 A1 19980730; DE 59806164 D1 20021212; EP 0900035 A1 19990310; EP 0900035 B1 20021106; US 5931531 A 19990803; WO 9832353 A1 19980730

INPADOC legal status


2004-10-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-10-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040801

2004-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-08-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040803

2004-08-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040801

2003-10-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-05-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-24 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030324

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-01-20 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030120

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-01-20 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030120

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806164 20021212

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR NL

2001-08-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010621

1999-03-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981223

1999-03-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR NL