Global Patent Index - EP 0900086 A4

EP 0900086 A4 2000-01-12 - ENHANCEMENT OF SLEEP WITH A GROWTH HORMONE SECRETAGOGUE

Title (en)

ENHANCEMENT OF SLEEP WITH A GROWTH HORMONE SECRETAGOGUE

Title (de)

VERBESSERUNG DES SCHLAFS MITTELS EINES DIE SEKRETION VON WACHSTUMSHORMONEN FÖRDERNDEN STOFFES

Title (fr)

STIMULATION DU SOMMEIL AVEC UN SECRETAGOGUE D'HORMONE DE CROISSANCE

Publication

EP 0900086 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97924576 A

Priority

  • GB 9611002 A
  • US 9707516 W
  • US 1678796 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9741879A1] A growth hormone secretagogue is useful, alone or in combination with other agents, for enhancing and improving the quality of sleep, in particular by increasing sleep efficiency and augmenting sleep maintenance.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 38/00; A61K 31/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07D 471/10 (2006.01); A61K 31/00 (2006.01); A61K 31/435 (2006.01); A61K 31/438 (2006.01); A61K 31/475 (2006.01); A61K 31/55 (2006.01); A61K 38/05 (2006.01); A61K 38/25 (2006.01); A61K 38/30 (2006.01); A61K 45/00 (2006.01); A61P 25/20 (2006.01); C07D 495/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 38/25 (2013.01); A61K 31/438 (2013.01); A61K 31/475 (2013.01); A61K 31/55 (2013.01); A61K 38/05 (2013.01); A61K 38/30 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. A61K 38/25 + A61K 2300/00
  2. A61K 38/30 + A61K 2300/00

Citation (search report)

  • [X] EP 0662481 A1 19950712 - MERCK & CO INC [US]
  • [PX] WO 9640105 A1 19961219 - ARCH DEV CORP [US]
  • [E] WO 9734604 A1 19970925 - MERCK & CO INC [US], et al
  • [A] BIOLOGICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 1994, 1994, Philadelphia, PA, US; abstract no. 75188, M L HARTMAN ET AL.: "Normal control of growth hormone secretion" XP002122541 & HORMONE RESEARCH, vol. 40, no. 1-3, 1993, Basel, pages 37 - 47HORMONE RESEARCHBasel1993401-33747
  • [A] J TAKAHARA ET AL.: "Stimulatory effects of gamma-hydroxybutyric acid on growth hormone and prolactin release in humans", J CLIN. ENDOCRIN. METAB., vol. 44, no. 5, 1977, USA, pages 1014 - 1017, XP000600031
  • [A] J TAKAHARA ET AL.: "Inhibitory effects of substance P on the gamma-aminobutyric acid and gamma-hydroxybutyric acid-induced growth hormone and prolactin release in male rats", LIFE SCIENCES, vol. 29, no. 12, 1981, UK, pages 1229 - 1233, XP000600046
  • [A] M MAMELAK ET AL.: "The effects of gamma-hydroxybutyrate on sleep", BIOLOGICAL PSYCHIATRY, vol. 12, no. 2, 1977, USA, pages 273 - 288, XP000600034
  • [PX] DATABASE MEDLINE 1 January 1900 (1900-01-01), XP002122540, Database accession no. 96320058 & G COPINSCHI ET AL.: "Effects of a 7-day treatment with a novel, orally active, growth hormone secretagogue, MK-677,on 24-hour GH profiles, insulin-like growth factor I, amd adrenocortical function in normal young men", J. CLIN. ENDOCRINOL. METABOLISM, vol. 81, no. 8, August 1996 (1996-08-01), pages 2776 - 2782G COPINSCHI ET AL.Effects of a 7-day treatment with a novel, orally active, growth hormone secretagogue, MK-677,on 24-hour GH profiles, insulin-like growth factor I, amd adrenocortical function in normal young menJ. CLIN. ENDOCRINOL. METABOLISM19960881827762782
  • See also references of WO 9741879A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9741879 A1 19971113; AU 2996397 A 19971126; AU 711884 B2 19991021; CA 2253390 A1 19971113; EP 0900086 A1 19990310; EP 0900086 A4 20000112; JP 2000511885 A 20000912

INPADOC legal status


2001-07-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010102

2000-08-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000620

2000-01-12 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 19991129

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

1999-03-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981207

1999-03-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE