Global patent index - EP 0900143 B1

EP 0900143 B1 2000-01-12 - TURNING ARRANGEMENT FOR A PRINTING MACHINE, ESPECIALLY A SHEET-FEED OFFSET PRINTING MACHINE

Title (en)

TURNING ARRANGEMENT FOR A PRINTING MACHINE, ESPECIALLY A SHEET-FEED OFFSET PRINTING MACHINE

Title (de)

WENDEEINRICHTUNG FÜR EINE DRUCKMASCHINE, INSBESONDERE EINE BOGENROTATIONS-OFFSETDRUCKMASCHINE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE RENVERSEMENT POUR MACHINE A IMPRIMER, NOTAMMENT MACHINE A IMPRIMER OFFSET ROTATIVE A FEUILLES

Publication

EP 0900143 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97914281 A

Priority

  • DE 19615730 A
  • EP 9701424 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19615730A1] A turning arrangement (1) for a printing machine comprises a transfer drum (2) fitted between a first (4) and a second counter-pressure cylinder (6), beneath which there is a register cylinder (16) with a plurality of suction apertures (20) holding the sheets (10) which, after the grippers (8a, 8b) have opened, conveys the sheets (10) in register into an intermediate storage system (19) in which the sheets (10) are temporarily stored in substantially tensioned form on a first sheet guide (24) fitted with blower nozzles (22). A jawed turning grip device (30) fitted on the transfer drum (2) grips the rear edge of the sheet (10) laid in the intermediate storage system (19) and transfers it to a prior art gripping device (34) formed on the subsequent counter-pressure cylinder (6) which takes the sheet (10) turned in this way to a downstream pressure slot to print the reverse side of the sheet.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 21/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 21/06 (2006.01); B41F 21/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 21/106 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19615730 A1 19971023; CN 1216501 A 19990512; CZ 292390 B6 20030917; CZ 9803209 A3 19990217; EP 0900143 A1 19990310; EP 0900143 B1 20000112; JP 2000508594 A 20000711; WO 9739896 A1 19971030

INPADOC legal status

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141001

2014-12-31 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59701011

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20141001

2014-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59701011

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130424

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2007-01-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20061130

2005-03-21 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050321

2005-03-16 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050316

- Year of fee payment: 09

2004-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2004-11-10 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040321

2004-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-21 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040321

2003-04-03 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030403

- Year of fee payment: 07

2003-02-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030224

- Year of fee payment: 07

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2000-12-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-05-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-04-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000329

2000-03-30 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2000-02-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59701011

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20000217

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-01-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-01-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: STEPHAN, GUENTER

1999-08-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990616

1999-04-07 [ITCL] IT: TRANSLATION FOR EP CLAIMS FILED

- Representative's name: STUDIO TORTA SOCIETA' SEMPLICE

1999-03-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980825

1999-03-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI