Global Patent Index - EP 0900171 B1

EP 0900171 B1 2000-01-26 - YARN TENSIONING DEVICE AND TEXTILE MACHINE EQUIPPED THEREWITH

Title (en)

YARN TENSIONING DEVICE AND TEXTILE MACHINE EQUIPPED THEREWITH

Title (de)

FADENSPANNVORRICHTUNG UND TEXTILMASCHINE MIT SOLCHER VORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF TENDEUR DE FIL ET MATERIEL TEXTILE EQUIPE D'UN TEL DISPOSITIF

Publication

EP 0900171 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97914358 A

Priority

  • FR 9700395 W
  • FR 9605119 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9738932A1] This invention features a yarn tensioning device comprising a freely rotatable pulley (P) mounted at the end of a spindle (5), the yarn engaging the surface of the pulley. This pulley is associated with a braking system constituted by permanent magnets (19) that can be moved away or towards said pulley. The control of the spacing is provided by a first set (23, 24) which exerts a thrust aimed at bringing the magnet support (20) towards the ring (18) associated with the pulley (P); a second set (25, 32) exerting a counter-thrust aimed at spacing the magnets (19). This counter-thrust is obtained by compressed air, the supply of which is provided simultaneously on all the yarn tensioning devices of the machine through a pneumatic feeder line.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 59/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 59/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D02G 3/285 (2013.01); B65H 59/16 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9738932 A1 19971023; AT 189179 T 20000215; AU 2163597 A 19971107; CN 1085975 C 20020605; CN 1206387 A 19990127; DE 69701222 D1 20000302; DE 69701222 T2 20000928; EP 0900171 A1 19990310; EP 0900171 B1 20000126; ES 2142150 T3 20000401; FR 2747663 A1 19971024; FR 2747663 B1 19980522; JP 2001500462 A 20010116; JP 3898763 B2 20070328; US 5943851 A 19990831

INPADOC legal status


2014-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121002

2013-01-17 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69701222

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20121002

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100307

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110404

2011-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110310

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-04-19 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20110419

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100306

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090319

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090323

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ICBT YARN

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-11-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20050306

2005-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ICBT YARN

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-06 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050306

2005-03-06 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050306

2004-04-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040430

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-02-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040227

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-02-17 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040217

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-01-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-04-14 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-04-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000320

2000-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2142150

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-03-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69701222

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-03-02

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES GB IT

2000-01-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 189179

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-02-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-08-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990706

1999-06-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ICBT YARN

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-03-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980603

1999-03-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES GB IT