Global Patent Index - EP 0900263 B1

EP 0900263 B1 2000-07-26 - PROCESS FOR CLEANING PLASTIC SURFACES AND MEANS FOR CARRYING OUT THE PROCESS

Title (en)

PROCESS FOR CLEANING PLASTIC SURFACES AND MEANS FOR CARRYING OUT THE PROCESS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR REINIGUNG VON KUNSTSTOFFOBERFLÄCHEN UND MITTEL ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DES VERFAHRENS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE NETTOYAGE DE SURFACES EN PLASTIQUE ET MOYEN POUR METTRE EN OEUVRE LEDIT PROCEDE

Publication

EP 0900263 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97919394 A

Priority

  • DE 19617096 A
  • EP 9701991 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19617096A1] This invention concerns a process in which surfaces are moistened with an aqueous cleaning agent which contains synthetic surfactant, water soluble solvent, alkali and soap and polyethylene wax and, simultaneously or subsequently, are wiped with a cloth whereby the dirt is removed with the cleaning agent. This process is characterized by high cleaning effectiveness and little tendency of the cleaned surfaces to become resoiled.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/37; C11D 3/43; C11D 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/83 (2006.01); C11D 3/20 (2006.01); C11D 3/37 (2006.01); C11D 10/04 (2006.01); C11D 11/00 (2006.01); C11D 1/14 (2006.01); C11D 1/29 (2006.01); C11D 1/66 (2006.01); C11D 1/72 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/43 (2013.01); C11D 1/83 (2013.01); C11D 3/2068 (2013.01); C11D 3/3707 (2013.01); C11D 10/04 (2013.01); C11D 11/0035 (2013.01); C11D 1/146 (2013.01); C11D 1/29 (2013.01); C11D 1/662 (2013.01); C11D 1/72 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

US 4105464 A 19780808 - OSSWALD GUNTER, et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19617096 A1 19971106; AT 194999 T 20000815; EP 0900263 A1 19990310; EP 0900263 B1 20000726; ES 2149589 T3 20001101; WO 9741198 A1 19971106

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111031

2012-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110422

2012-06-04 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20120604

2012-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110421

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110421

2012-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110430

2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110502

2012-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111101

2012-01-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20111230

2012-01-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM01

- Ref Document Number: 194999

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20110421

2011-11-09 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20111101

2011-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *HENKEL K.G.A.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20110430

2011-10-31 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59702086

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2010-10-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100423

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100413

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100430

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100421

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100402

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-07-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100505

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-07-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100521

- Year of fee payment: 14

2001-07-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2149589

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-10-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-10-05 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-08-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59702086

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-08-31

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR IT NL

2000-07-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 194999

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-08-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-03-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000114

1999-03-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19981021

1999-03-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR IT NL