Global Patent Index - EP 0900282 A4

EP 0900282 A4 2001-04-11 - OB RECEPTOR ISOFORMS AND NUCLEIC ACIDS ENCODING THEM

Title (en)

OB RECEPTOR ISOFORMS AND NUCLEIC ACIDS ENCODING THEM

Title (de)

ISOFORMEN DES OB-REZEPTORS UND DIE DAFÜR KODIERENDEN NUKLEINSÄUREN.

Title (fr)

ISOFORMES DE RECEPTEUR DU GENE OB ET ACIDES NUCLEIQUES LES CODANT

Publication

EP 0900282 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97922646 A

Priority

  • GB 9610995 A
  • US 9707521 W
  • US 1689996 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9742340A1] The ob receptor has numerous isoforms resulting from alternative splicing; three novel isoforms, designated c', f, and g are disclosed. The nucleic acids encoding these isoforms are taught. Also part of the invention are vectors containing the nucleic acid encoding the receptors, host cells transformed with these genes, and assays which use the genes or protein isoforms.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12P 21/00; A61K 38/00; A61K 38/19; A61K 45/05; C07H 21/04; C07K 1/00; C07K 14/52; C12N 1/20; G01N 33/53

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/575 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/5759 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [E] WO 9731015 A1 19970828 - MERCK & CO INC [US], et al
  • [E] WO 9741217 A1 19971106 - OTSUKA PHARMA CO LTD [JP], et al
  • [A] TAKASHI MURAKAMI ET AL: "CLONING OF RAT OBESE CDNA AND ITS EXPRESSION IN OBESE RATS", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS,US,ACADEMIC PRESS INC. ORLANDO, FL, vol. 209, no. 3, 26 April 1995 (1995-04-26), pages 944 - 952, XP000602094, ISSN: 0006-291X
  • [PX] WANG M. ET AL.: "A novel leptin receptor isoform in rat", FEBS LETTERS, vol. 392, August 1996 (1996-08-01), pages 87 - 90, XP000973254
  • [PX] "LEPTIN RECEPTOR MISSENSE MUTATION IN THE FATTY ZUCKER RAT", NATURE GENETICS,US,NEW YORK, NY, vol. 13, no. 1, 1 May 1995 (1995-05-01), pages 18 - 19, XP000611494, ISSN: 1061-4036
  • See also references of WO 9742340A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9742340 A1 19971113; CA 2253832 A1 19971113; EP 0900282 A1 19990310; EP 0900282 A4 20010411; JP 2000512486 A 20000926

INPADOC legal status


2003-06-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20021203

2001-04-11 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20010227

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7C 12P 21/00 A, 7C 12N 1/20 B, 7G 01N 33/53 B, 7C 07H 21/04 B, 7C 07K 1/00 B, 7C 07K 14/52 B, 7A 61K 45/05 B, 7A 61K 38/19 B, 7A 61K 38/00 B

1999-12-29 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: OB RECEPTOR ISOFORMS AND NUCLEIC ACIDS ENCODING THEM

1999-03-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19981207

1999-03-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE