Global Patent Index - EP 0900297 B1

EP 0900297 B1 2000-03-29 - DEVICE FOR LIQUID TREATMENT OF A TEXTILE WEB

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR LIQUID TREATMENT OF A TEXTILE WEB

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR FLÜSSIGKEITSBEHANDLUNG EINER TEXTILEN WARENBAHN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR LE TRAITEMENT LIQUIDE D'UNE BANDE TEXTILE

Publication

EP 0900297 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97914048 A

Priority

  • DE 9700032 W
  • DE 29607591 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6158256A] PCT No. PCT/DE97/00032 Sec. 371 Date Aug. 18, 1999 Sec. 102(e) Date Aug. 18, 1999 PCT Filed Jan. 10, 1997 PCT Pub. No. WO97/41289 PCT Pub. Date Nov. 6, 1997An apparatus for liquid treatment of a textile web having at least one driven winding roller, onto which the textile web can be wound, and a basin located below the winding roller and extending over its length, which can be filled with treatment liquid, in which at least one deflection roller for the textile web is arranged. A guide roller which extends parallel to the axis of the winding roller over the width of the textile web, and rests against the fabric roll which forms on the winding roller, from the bottom, is provided, and has openings on its otherwise cylindrical circumference, which are arranged so as to avoid zones without openings which run in the circumference direction, and are uniformly distributed over the circumference.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06B 3/32; D06B 23/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06B 3/32 (2006.01); D06B 23/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06B 3/32 (2013.01); D06B 23/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29607591 U1 19970904; EP 0900297 A1 19990310; EP 0900297 B1 20000329; ES 2145589 T3 20000701; US 6158256 A 20001212; WO 9741289 A1 19971106

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070110

2006-09-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-08-28 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2006-08-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060801

2006-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060131

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-04-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040112

2005-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050131

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-01-17 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20050117

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-01-14 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20050114

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-10-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-10-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040801

2004-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-08-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040801

2004-07-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: EDUARD *KUSTERS MASCHINENFABRIK G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G

- Effective date: 20040131

2004-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040131

2004-01-12 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040112

2003-08-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030110

2003-01-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030130

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-01-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20030128

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-01-20 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030120

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-01-20 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030120

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-01-10 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030110

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-17 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20011217

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-03-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-24 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-07-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2145589 T3

2000-05-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701368 20000504

2000-04-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000329

2000-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-03-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: R. A. EGLI & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL

2000-03-03 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

1999-05-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990407

1999-03-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980824

1999-03-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL