Global Patent Index - EP 0900307 B1

EP 0900307 B1 2000-11-08 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR INSULATING BUILDING PARTS AND INSTALLATIONS

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR INSULATING BUILDING PARTS AND INSTALLATIONS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ISOLIEREN VON GEBÄUDETEILEN UND EINBAUTEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR ISOLER DES PARTIES DE BATIMENTS ET DES ELEMENTS ENCASTRES

Publication

EP 0900307 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97924959 A

Priority

  • DE 19620600 A
  • EP 9702562 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19620600A1] A metering screw (20) meters dry granular perlite material from above into a pressure container (10) which can be connected to a compressor (30). At the same time, the perlite material is mixed with an inorganic aqueous binder from a supply vessel (22). The resultant adhesive dry compound is pressurized in the pressure container (10) and fed via a feed line (32) to a cavity in a building. A flexible lance at the end of the feed line (32) injects the insulating compound into the cavity and simultaneously compresses it. After hardening, a cohesive, dimensionally stable insulating body with a high heat-insulating factor is produced.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 1/76; E04F 21/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/76 (2006.01); E04F 21/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 21/12 (2013.01); E04B 1/7604 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19620600 A1 19971127; DE 19620600 C2 20000511; AT 197485 T 20001111; EP 0900307 A1 19990310; EP 0900307 B1 20001108; WO 9744545 A1 19971127

INPADOC legal status


2002-12-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021203

2002-01-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-10-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-07-23 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20010723

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-06-19 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010619

2001-06-19 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010619

2001-05-20 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010520

2001-04-06 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-04-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-12-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702608 20001214

2000-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI NL

2000-11-08 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001108

2000-11-08 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001108

2000-11-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 197485 T 20001111

1999-09-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990716

1999-03-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981114

1999-03-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI NL