Global Patent Index - EP 0900354 B1

EP 0900354 B1 2000-11-15 - METHOD OF DETONATOR CONTROL WITH ELECTRONIC IGNITION MODULE, CODED BLAST CONTROLLING UNIT AND IGNITION MODULE FOR ITS IMPLEMENTATION

Title (en)

METHOD OF DETONATOR CONTROL WITH ELECTRONIC IGNITION MODULE, CODED BLAST CONTROLLING UNIT AND IGNITION MODULE FOR ITS IMPLEMENTATION

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM STEUERN EINES ZÜNDERS MIT EINEM ELEKTRONISCHEN ZÜNDMODUL; FEUERLEITUNGSCODES- UND ZÜNDMODULEINHEIT

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE COMMANDE DE DETONATEURS DU TYPE A MODULE D'ALLUMAGE ELECTRONIQUE, ENSEMBLE CODE DE COMMANDE DE TIR ET MODULE D'ALLUMAGE POUR SA MISE EN OEUVRE

Publication

EP 0900354 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97925114 A

Priority

  • FR 9700891 W
  • FR 9606509 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9745696A1] The invention discloses a method of detonator control with electronic ignition module (15). Each module (15) is associated with specific parameters comprising at least one identification parameter and one explosion delay time, and comprises a firing capacitance and a rudimentary internal clock. The modules (15) are capable of communicating with a blast control unit (17) equipped with a reference time base. The method comprises the following steps: storing the identification parameters in the module with a programming unit (18); effecting for each successive module and the blast controlling unit a calibration of its internal clock, and sending the associated delay time to the module; sending a firing capacitance charging command to the modules; sending the modules a firing commande via the blast control unit, triggering possible reinitialization of the internal clocks and a blast sequence.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42C 11/06; F42D 1/055

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42C 11/06 (2006.01); F42B 3/12 (2006.01); F42D 1/055 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42D 1/055 (2013.01); F42B 3/122 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9745696 A1 19971204; AT 197644 T 20001215; AU 3036497 A 19980105; AU 717346 B2 20000323; DE 69703542 D1 20001221; DE 69703542 T2 20010705; DE 900354 T1 19991209; EP 0900354 A1 19990310; EP 0900354 B1 20001115; ES 2132048 T1 19990816; ES 2132048 T3 20010216; FR 2749073 A1 19971128; FR 2749073 B1 19980814; JP 2000510943 A 20000822; PT 900354 E 20010531; US 6173651 B1 20010116; ZA 9704469 B 19981117

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-08 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20180508

2017-08-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170530

2017-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170520

2017-07-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 197644 T

- Effective date: 20170521

2017-07-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2017-06-14 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20170520

2017-05-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2017-05-21 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69703542

2016-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160506

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160427

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20160420

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160527

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160519

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160518

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160421

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160516

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160531

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-04-18 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: DAVEY BICKFORD, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: DAVEY BICKFORD, ROUEN, FR

- Document: DE 69703542

- Effective date: 20130227

2013-04-18 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69703542

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE VOLLMANN & HEMMER, DE

- Effective date: 20130227

2013-02-22 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Effective date: 20130123

2012-12-31 [REG CH PCOW] CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF PATENT OWNER(S)

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: LE MOULIN GASPARD, 89550 HERY (FR)

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-08-22 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2001-05-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010531

2001-05-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20010214

2001-05-21 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010521

2001-04-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-03-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KIRKER & CIE SA

2001-03-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010214

2001-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2132048 T3

2001-02-16 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010216

2001-02-15 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010215

2000-12-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69703542 20001221

2000-12-13 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-11-15 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001115

2000-11-15 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001115

2000-11-15 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001115

2000-11-15 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001115

2000-11-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 197644 T 20001215

2000-11-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PATHE, CLAUDE

2000-11-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: TROUSSELLE, RAPHAEL

2000-11-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: CLOT, PHILIPPE

2000-11-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: FIVAZ, ERIC

2000-04-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990611

2000-03-29 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD OF DETONATOR CONTROL WITH ELECTRONIC IGNITION MODULE, CODED BLAST CONTROLLING UNIT AND IGNITION MODULE FOR ITS IMPLEMENTATION

1999-12-09 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

1999-10-06 [GBC] GB: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED (GB SECTION 78(7)/1977)

1999-09-15 [TCAT] AT: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS FILED

1999-08-16 [REG ES BA2A] PROVISIONAL PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2132048 T1

1999-07-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990611

1999-07-23 [ITCL] IT: TRANSLATION FOR EP CLAIMS FILED

- Representative's name: STUDIO TORTA SOCIETA' SEMPLICE

1999-03-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981228

1999-03-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE